Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0963546

EP0963546 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR INVESTIGATING TOUGHENING MECHANISMS AND CRACK ADVANCE IN LIGHTWEIGHT MATERIALS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  29.12.2006
Database last updated on 20.01.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip29.12.2006Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 31.01.2007  [2007/05]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Kennefick, Christine Marie
2029 Turtle Pond Drive
Reston, VA 20191 / US
[2006/24]
Former [2002/47]For all designated states
Kennefick, Christine Marie
Apartment 2B, 1009 Warwick Drive
Aberdeen, MD 21001 / US
Former [1999/50]For all designated states
Deluca, John P.
10th Floor, 1400 K Street, N.W.
Washington D.C. 20005-2477 / US
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
[1999/50]
Representative(s)Brunner, Michael John
Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower
20 Primrose Street
London EC2A 2ES / GB
[N/P]
Former [1999/50]Brunner, Michael John
GILL JENNINGS & EVERY Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street
London EC2M 7LH / GB
Application number, filing date97955027.424.11.1997
[1999/50]
WO1997US22062
Priority number, dateUS1997080546625.02.1997         Original published format: US 805466
[1999/50]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9837399
Date:27.08.1998
Language:EN
[1998/34]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0963546
Date:15.12.1999
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.08.1998
[1999/50]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US27.08.1998
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP17.11.2000
ClassificationInternational:G01N3/08, G06F17/40
[2000/52]
Former International [1999/50]G01N3/08
Designated contracting statesDE,   GB [1999/50]
TitleGerman:GERAT UND VERFAHREN ZUR ANALYSE VON FESTIGUNGSMECHANISMEN UND VON DER ENTWICKLUNG VON RISSEN IN LEICHTEN MATERIALEN[1999/50]
English:METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR INVESTIGATING TOUGHENING MECHANISMS AND CRACK ADVANCE IN LIGHTWEIGHT MATERIALS[1999/50]
French:APPAREIL ET PROCEDE POUR ANALYSER LES MECANISMES DE RENFORCEMENT ET L'EVOLUTION DES FISSURES DANS DES MATERIAUX LEGERS[1999/50]
Entry into regional phase02.08.1999National basic fee paid 
02.08.1999Search fee paid 
02.08.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
02.08.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure15.01.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
02.08.1999Examination requested  [1999/50]
05.04.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
30.07.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.04.2006Communication of intention to grant the patent
15.08.2006Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2007/05]
15.09.2006Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [2007/05]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.12.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
13.11.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
14.11.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
13.11.2002Renewal fee patent year 06
26.11.2003Renewal fee patent year 07
12.11.2004Renewal fee patent year 08
14.11.2005Renewal fee patent year 09
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.11.199903   M06   Fee paid on   27.12.1999
Documents cited:Search[A]US3983745  (JUUSOLA WILLIAM D) [A] 1 * column 4, line 30 - column 5, line 6 *;
 [A]US5140528  (SWAMINATHAN V P [US], et al) [A] 1 * column 2, line 46 - line 62 * * column 5, line 54 - column 6, line 47 * * column 7, line 37 - column 8, line 5 *;
 [A]  WAS G S ET AL, "Deformation and fracture in microlaminates", THIN SOLID FILMS,CH,ELSEVIER-SEQUOIA S.A. LAUSANNE, (19960930), vol. 286, no. 1, ISSN 0040-6090, pages 1 - 31, XP004049409 [A] 1,11 * page 16, paragraph 5 - page 29 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0040-6090(96)08905-5
 [A]  SESHADRI ET AL., "numerical computation of the toughening increments...", CERAM.ENGIN.SCI. PROCEEDINGS, (1987), vol. 8, no. 7-8, pages 671 - 684, XP000953452 [A] 1,11 * the whole document *
 [A]  HOM ET AL., "some recent developments in numerical modelling ...", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL FOR NUMERICAL METHODS IN ENGINEERING, (1989), vol. 27, pages 233 - 255, XP000961387 [A] 1 * page 243 - page 244 * * page 250 - page 251 *
International search[A]US5602329
 [A]US4895027
 [A]US4299120
 [A]US4116049