Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0853353

EP0853353 - Contact spring unit for an electrical switching function [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  23.02.2001
Database last updated on 18.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip23.02.2001No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 11.04.2001 [2001/15]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
EATON CONTROLS GmbH & Co. KG
An den Nahewiesen 16-18
55445 Langenlonsheim / DE
[1998/29]
Inventor(s)01 / Kunz, Hans Peter
Ober dem Dorf 1
55442 Breitscheid / DE
02 / Markfort, Stefan
Römerstrasse 44
55413 Trechtingshausen / DE
[1998/29]
Representative(s)Becker, Bernd
Patentanwälte
BECKER & AUE
Saarlandstrasse 66
55411 Bingen / DE
[N/P]
Former [1998/29]Becker, Bernd, Dipl.-Ing.
Patentanwälte BECKER & AUE Saarlandstrasse 66
55411 Bingen / DE
Application number, filing date98100094.607.01.1998
[1998/29]
Priority number, dateDE199710072611.01.1997         Original published format: DE 19700726
[1998/29]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0853353
Date:15.07.1998
Language:DE
[1998/29]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0853353
Date:02.12.1998
[1998/49]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0853353
Date:26.04.2000
Language:DE
[2000/17]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP21.10.1998
ClassificationInternational:H01R13/70, H01H1/26
[1998/50]
Former International [1998/29]H01R13/70
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT [1999/32]
Former [1998/29]AT,  BE,  CH,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Kontaktfeder-Einheit für elektrische Schaltfunktionen[1998/29]
English:Contact spring unit for an electrical switching function[1998/29]
French:Utité de ressort de contact realisant une fonction de commutation[1998/29]
Examination procedure25.05.1999Examination requested  [1999/30]
16.07.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
13.10.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
10.12.1999Fee for grant paid
10.12.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)27.01.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2001/15]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.12.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0346662  (EATON CORP [US]) [A] 1-14 * abstract *;
 [A]US4006336  (BOYDEN ROBERT E) [A] 1-14 * abstract *