Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0853017

EP0853017 - Method and apparatus for controlling a vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  04.02.2005
Database last updated on 19.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip04.02.2005No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 23.03.2005  [2005/12]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
UNISIA JECS CORPORATION
1370, Onna Atsugi-shi
Kanagawa-ken 243-8510 / JP
[N/P]
Former [1999/09]For all designated states
UNISIA JECS CORPORATION
1370, Onna
Atsugi-shi, Kanagawa-ken 243-8510 / JP
Former [1998/29]For all designated states
UNISIA JECS CORPORATION
1370, Onna
Atsugi-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Kobayashi, Hiroshi
c/o Unisia Jecs Corporation, 1370, Onna
Atsugi-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP
[1998/29]
Representative(s)Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstrasse 4
80802 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1998/29]Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät
Maximilianstrasse 58
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date98100226.408.01.1998
[1998/29]
Priority number, dateJP1997000301710.01.1997         Original published format: JP 301797
[1998/29]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0853017
Date:15.07.1998
Language:EN
[1998/29]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0853017
Date:12.04.2000
[2000/15]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0853017
Date:31.03.2004
Language:EN
[2004/14]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP24.02.2000
ClassificationInternational:B60K41/06
[1998/29]
Designated contracting statesDE,   GB [2000/51]
Former [1998/29]AT,  BE,  CH,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Steuerverfahren und -vorrichtung für ein Fahrzeug[1998/29]
English:Method and apparatus for controlling a vehicle[1998/29]
French:Procédé et dispositif de commande pour véhicule[1998/29]
Examination procedure30.08.2000Examination requested  [2000/43]
04.04.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
25.07.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.07.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
31.10.2003Fee for grant paid
31.10.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)04.01.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/12]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.01.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
30.01.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
30.01.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
30.01.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
30.01.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[X]US5295415  (ABE MITSUTOSHI [JP], et al) [X] 1-8 * column 1, line 43 - line 54 * * column 3, line 36 - column 4, line 31 * * column 10, line 59 - column 11, line 8; figures 5,13,19,20 *;
 [X]EP0737598  (HITACHI LTD [JP]) [X] 1,3-5,7,8 * column 11, line 41 - line 46; figure 18 * * abstract *;
 [X]US5307270  (GRAF FRIEDRICH [DE]) [X] 1,3-5,7,8 * column 1, line 7 - line 19 * * column 3, line 49 - line 55 *;
 [X]EP0362885  (MAZDA MOTOR [JP]) [X] 1,5 * page 2, line 38 - line 39 *;
 [A]DE3830938  (OPEL ADAM AG [DE]) [A] 1,5 * column 4, line 39 - column 5, line 26; figures 1-5 *