Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0863628

EP0863628 - Method and means to operate a laser emitter system for optical free space communication [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  25.10.2002
Database last updated on 15.08.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip15.02.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 19.03.2008  [2008/12]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
CONTRAVES SPACE AG
Schaffhauserstrasse 580
8052 Zürich / CH
[2000/10]
Former [1998/37]For all designated states
OERLIKON CONTRAVES AG
Birchstrasse 155
8050 Zürich / CH
Inventor(s)01 / Fischer, Edgar, Dr. Ing.
Häggliweg 6
8555 Müllheim Dorf / CH
02 / Wandernoth, Bernhard, Dr. Ing.
Hausenstrasse 57
9533 Kirchberg / CH
03 / Mayor, Jean-Michel
rue Bullet 6
1400 Yverdon-les-Bains / CH
04 / Schmid, Beat
Frohburgweg 5
8180 Bülach / CH
 [2001/34]
Former [1998/37]01 / Fischer, Edgar, Dr. Ing.
Kreuzlingerstrasse 43A
8555 Müllheim Dorf / CH
02 / Wandernoth, Bernhard, Dr. Ing.
Hausenstrasse 57
9533 Kirchberg / CH
03 / Mayor, Jean-Michel
rue Bullet 6
1400 Yverdon-les-Bains / CH
04 / Schmid, Beat
Frohburgweg 5
8180 Bülach / CH
Representative(s)Hotz, Klaus
c/o OK pat AG, Patente Marken Lizenzen, Chamerstrasse 50
6300 Zug / CH
[N/P]
Former [1998/37]Hotz, Klaus, Dipl.-El.-Ing./ETH
c/o OK pat AG, Patente Marken Lizenzen, Hinterbergstrasse 36, Postfach 5254
6330 Cham / CH
Application number, filing date98100693.516.01.1998
[1998/37]
Priority number, dateCH1997000054907.03.1997         Original published format: CH 54997
[1998/37]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0863628
Date:09.09.1998
Language:DE
[1998/37]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0863628
Date:19.12.2001
Language:DE
[2001/51]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP08.07.1998
ClassificationInternational:H04B10/17
[1998/37]
Designated contracting statesBE,   CH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   SE [1999/21]
Former [1998/37]AT,  BE,  CH,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Anordnung zum Betreiben eines Laser-Sendesystems für optische Freiraum-Kommunikation[1998/37]
English:Method and means to operate a laser emitter system for optical free space communication[1998/37]
French:Méthode et dispositif pour l'opération d'un système d'émission à laser pour la communication optique dans l'espace libre[1998/37]
Examination procedure18.09.1998Examination requested  [1998/47]
12.07.1999Request for accelerated examination filed
13.09.1999Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
13.09.1999Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes
27.01.2000Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.07.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
25.08.2000Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.04.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
09.07.2001Communication of intention to grant the patent
24.09.2001Fee for grant paid
24.09.2001Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)20.09.2002No opposition filed within time limit [2002/50]
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.12.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
12.12.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFR19.12.2001
IT19.12.2001
BE31.01.2002
SE19.03.2002
[2008/12]
Former [2006/32]FR19.12.2001
BE31.01.2002
SE19.03.2002
Former [2003/48]BE31.01.2002
SE19.03.2002
Former [2002/27]SE19.03.2002
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0670642  (CANON KK [JP]) [A] 1-15 * column 2, line 1 - column 3, line 35; figures 1-7 *;
 [A]GB2267006  (ALCATEL ESPACE [FR]) [A] 1 * page 1, line 1 - page 5, line 30 *;
 [A]US5264960  (GLANCE BERNARD [US]) [A] 1 * column 1, line 44 - column 2, line 3 *;
 [A]US5136598  (WELLER JOSEPH F [US], et al) [A] 1;
 [A]US4556980  (SMITH DAVID W [GB], et al) [A] 1
 [A]  KRAINAK M A, "INTERSATELLITE COMMUNICATIONS OPTOELECTRONICS RESEARCH AT THE GODDARD SPACE FLIGHT CENTER", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL TELESYSTEMS CONFERENCE (NTC), WASHINGTON, MAY 19 - 20, 1992, INSTITUTE OF ELECTRICAL AND ELECTRONICS ENGINEERS, (19920519), no. -, pages 14.9 - 14.12, XP000342462 [A] 1-15 * page 14.10, column L, paragraphs 3-4; figure 2 *
Examination   "Monolithic Glass Block Lasercom Terminal: Hardware proof of concept and test results", Carlson R T; Drake M D; Jaeger J L, SPIE Proc Vol 2381, pages 90-102, 1985,