blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0838518 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0838518



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 93
17.09.2003 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
04.10.2002 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
01.08.2002 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
01.08.2002 Translation of the claims Search / examination 2
01.08.2002 Translation of the claims Search / examination 2
02.05.2002 Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant Search / examination 3
24.04.2002 Annex to a communication Search / examination 2
24.04.2002 Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
24.04.2002 Brief communication to applicant/representative Search / examination 1
08.03.2002 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 1
18.02.2002 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
18.02.2002 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
18.02.2002 Text intended for grant Search / examination 7
16.02.2002 Request for transfer of rights Search / examination 10
29.11.2000 Claims Search / examination 2
29.11.2000 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
23.10.2000 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
17.09.1999 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 1
28.08.1999 Request for assignment Search / examination 2
15.12.1998 Maintenance of the application Search / examination 1
14.10.1998 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
14.10.1998 European search report Search / examination 4
20.01.1998 Abstract Search / examination 1
20.01.1998 Claims Search / examination 2
20.01.1998 Description Search / examination 6
20.01.1998 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
20.01.1998 General authorisation Search / examination 1
20.01.1998 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 6
31.03.1994 Priority document Search / examination 20