blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP0838518


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
19.09.2003 No opposition filed within time limit published on  05.11.2003  [2003/45]
27.09.2002 (Expected) grant published on  13.11.2002  [2002/46]
25.09.2002 Renewal fee
16.08.2002 Communication of intention to grant a patent
27.04.2002 Communication of intention to grant
27.04.2002 Communication of intention to grant a patent
08.03.2002 Change - applicant published on  24.04.2002  [2002/17]
11.02.2002 Communication of intention to grant
19.09.2001 Renewal fee
30.11.2000 Examination report or reply
21.10.2000 First examination report
18.10.2000 Examination report or reply
21.09.2000 Renewal fee
23.09.1999 Renewal fee
17.09.1999 Change - applicant published on  03.11.1999 [1999/44]
09.10.1998 Publication of search report published on  25.11.1998 [1998/48]
17.09.1998 Renewal fee
13.03.1998 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  29.04.1998 [1998/18]
13.03.1998 Request for examination filed published on  29.04.1998 [1998/18]
11.02.1998 Renewal fee