blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Legal status: EP0838518

Designated contracting states BE 
 DE 
 ES 
 FR 
Examination procedure01.08.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.01.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
20.01.1998Renewal fee patent year 04
20.01.1998Renewal fee patent year 05
09.09.1998Renewal fee patent year 06
13.09.1999Renewal fee patent year 07
13.09.2000Renewal fee patent year 08
12.09.2001Renewal fee patent year 09
12.09.2002Renewal fee patent year 10
European patent granted13.11.2002
Opposition procedure14.08.2003No opposition filed within time limit published on 05.11.2003 
INPADOC data   TooltipThe EPO does not accept any responsibility for the accuracy of legal status data relating to the post-grant phase, including but not limited to their completeness and fitness for specific purposes, nor can it guarantee that such data are up to date. For authoritative information, please refer to the relevant national patent authority.
Event date:29.04.1998 
Event description:DIVISIONAL APPLICATION: REFERENCE TO EARLIER APPLICATION
Ref Document Number:659207
Country of Ref Document:EP
Format of Ref Document F/P:P
 
Event date:29.04.1998 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:A2
Designated State(s):BE DE ES FR
 
Event date:29.04.1998 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED
Effective DATE:19980120
 
Event date:25.11.1998 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:A3
Designated State(s):BE DE ES FR
 
Event date:03.11.1999 
Event description:RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION TRANSFERRED
Owner Name:COGNIS DEUTSCHLAND GMBH
 
Event date:06.12.2000 
Event description:FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT DESPATCHED
Effective DATE:20001023
 
Event date:24.04.2002 
Event description:RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION TRANSFERRED
Owner Name:COGNIS DEUTSCHLAND GMBH & CO. KG
 
Event date:13.11.2002 
Event description:DIVISIONAL APPLICATION: REFERENCE TO EARLIER APPLICATION
Ref Document Number:659207
Country of Ref Document:EP
Format of Ref Document F/P:P
 
Event date:13.11.2002 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:B1
Designated State(s):BE DE ES FR
 
Event date:19.12.2002 
Event description:CORRESPONDS TO:
Ref Document Number:59310313
Country of Ref Document:DE
DATE OF REF DOCUMENT:20021219
Format of Ref Document F/P:P
 
Event date:01.05.2003 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG ES FG2A 2186021 T3
Code Expl.:+DEFINITIVE PROTECTION
 
Event date:13.06.2003 
Event description:FR: TRANSLATION FILED
 
Event date:30.09.2003 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:BE
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20030930
 
Event date:05.11.2003 
Event description:NO OPPOSITION FILED
Effective DATE:20030814
 
Event date:31.03.2004 
Event description:BE: LAPSED
Owner Name:*COGNIS DEUTSCHLAND G.M.B.H. & CO. K.G.
Effective DATE:20030930
 
Event date:30.08.2007 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:DE
Payment DATE:20070830
Year of Fee Payment:15
 
Event date:31.01.2008 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:ES
Payment DATE:20071024
Year of Fee Payment:15
 
Event date:30.04.2008 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:FR
Payment DATE:20070914
Year of Fee Payment:15
 
Event date:16.01.2009 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR TP
Code Expl.: TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY
 
Event date:03.07.2009 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR ST
Code Expl.:-NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE
Effective DATE:20090529
 
Event date:31.08.2009 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:DE
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20090401
 
Event date:30.10.2009 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:FR
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20080930
 
Event date:26.11.2009 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG ES FD2A
Code Expl.:-ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN
Effective DATE:20080904
 
Event date:29.01.2010 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:ES
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20080904