Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0838518

EP0838518 - Detergent mixtures [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  19.09.2003
Database last updated on 20.08.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip19.09.2003No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 05.11.2003  [2003/45]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Cognis Deutschland GmbH & Co. KG
Henkelstrasse 67
40589 Düsseldorf / DE
[2002/17]
Former [1999/44]For all designated states
Cognis Deutschland GmbH
Henkelstrasse 67
40589 Düsseldorf / DE
Former [1998/18]For all designated states
Henkel Kommanditgesellschaft auf Aktien
Henkelstrasse 67
40589 Düsseldorf-Holthausen / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Obiols, Oriol Ponsati, Dr.
c/o Alaba 45 2a
08005 Barcelona / ES
02 / Gilabert, Nuria Bonastre, Dr.
Galicia 9
08210 Barbeà del Vallès / ES
[1998/18]
Application number, filing date98100877.403.09.1993
[1998/18]
Priority number, dateUS1992094395711.09.1992         Original published format: US 943957
[1998/18]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0838518
Date:29.04.1998
Language:DE
[1998/18]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0838518
Date:25.11.1998
[1998/48]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0838518
Date:13.11.2002
Language:DE
[2002/46]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP14.10.1998
ClassificationInternational:C11D1/835, // C11D1:62
[1998/18]
Designated contracting statesBE,   DE,   ES,   FR [1998/18]
TitleGerman:Detergensgemische[1998/18]
English:Detergent mixtures[1998/18]
French:Mélanges de détergents[1998/18]
Examination procedure20.01.1998Examination requested  [1998/18]
23.10.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
29.11.2000Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.02.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
02.05.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
01.08.2002Fee for grant paid
01.08.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP93919251.4  / EP0659207
Opposition(s)14.08.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/45]
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.01.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
20.01.1998Renewal fee patent year 04
20.01.1998Renewal fee patent year 05
09.09.1998Renewal fee patent year 06
13.09.1999Renewal fee patent year 07
13.09.2000Renewal fee patent year 08
12.09.2001Renewal fee patent year 09
12.09.2002Renewal fee patent year 10
Documents cited:Search[DPA]WO9303130  (HENKEL KGAA [DE]) [DPA] 1,2,4,6 * the whole document *;
 [DPA]EP0547722  (COLGATE PALMOLIVE CO [US]) [DPA] 1-4,6 * the whole document *;
 [PA]WO9219693  (HENKEL KGAA [DE]) [PA] 1 * page 4, paragraph 4 - page 12, paragraph 3; claims 1-7,9-13 *;
 [PA]WO9222622  (HENKEL KGAA [DE]) [PA] 1 * page 3, paragraph 3 - page 12, paragraph 4; claims 1,4-14 *;
 [A]EP0385562  (AMWAY CORP [US]) [A] 1-4 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP0387064  (UNILEVER PLC [GB], et al) [A] 1,4 * the whole document *;
 [DA]WO8702050  (STALEY MFG CO A E [US]) [DA] 1 * claim - *;
 [A]WO8605509  (STALEY MFG CO A E [US]) [A] 1,5 * page 11, line 1 - page 13, line 17; claim - *;
 [A]EP0106692  (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [A] 1,2,4-6 * page 2, line 6 - page 10, line 32 * * page 11, line 20 - page 12, line 34; claims 1-6 *;
 [PA]WO9310748  (HENKEL KGAA [DE]) [PA] 1,4 * claim - *