Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0877235

EP0877235 - Apparatus for determining the mass of a product [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  22.08.2003
Database last updated on 24.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip22.08.2003Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 08.10.2003  [2003/41]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ROVEMA VERPACKUNGSMASCHINEN GMBH
Industriestrasse 1
35463 Fernwald / DE
[N/P]
Former [1998/46]For all designated states
Rovema Verpackungsmaschinen GmbH
Industriestrasse 1
35463 Fernwald / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Kammler, Roman, Dr.
Philosophenstrasse 27A
67547 Worms / DE
02 / Baur, Walter, Dr.
Herzbergstrasse 37-39
63584 Gründau / DE
[1998/46]
Application number, filing date98101026.722.01.1998
[1998/46]
Priority number, dateDE199711960009.05.1997         Original published format: DE 19719600
DE199711959709.05.1997         Original published format: DE 19719597
[1998/46]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0877235
Date:11.11.1998
Language:DE
[1998/46]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0877235
Date:19.01.2000
[2000/03]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP06.12.1999
ClassificationInternational:G01G11/00, G01G13/00, G01G21/00
[2000/03]
Former International [1998/46]G01G11/00, G01G13/00
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL [2000/39]
Former [1998/46]AT,  BE,  CH,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Vorrichtung zum Bestimmen der Masse eines Produktes[1998/46]
English:Apparatus for determining the mass of a product[1998/46]
French:Appareil de mesure de la masse d'un produit[1998/46]
Examination procedure30.01.1998Examination requested  [1998/46]
05.11.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
17.03.2003Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2003/41]
24.04.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2003/41]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.01.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
26.01.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
25.01.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.01.200306   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XY]US4055227  (BRACKETT GEORGE E) [X] 1,2 * column 7, line 8 - line 12 * [Y] 8;
 [A]US4148370  (LUCHINGER PAUL ET AL) [A] 1 * column 2, line 37 - line 40 * * column 4, line 8 - line 13 *;
 [Y]US4151932  (WACHTLER FRANK A) [Y] 8 * column A *