Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0855823

EP0855823 - Display method, display apparatus and communication method [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  07.08.2009
Database last updated on 20.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip07.08.2009No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 09.09.2009  [2009/37]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Sony Corporation
7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome
Shinagawa-ku
Tokyo / JP
[N/P]
Former [2008/40]For all designated states
Sony Corporation
7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome, Shinagawa-ku
Tokyo / JP
Former [1998/31]For all designated states
SONY CORPORATION
7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku
Tokyo / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Sugaya, Shigeru
c/o Sony Corporation, 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome
Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo / JP
[1998/31]
Representative(s)Körber, Wolfhart , et al
Mitscherlich & Partner
Patentanwälte
Sonnenstrasse 33
80331 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1998/31]Körber, Wolfhart, Dr. rer.nat. , et al
Patentanwälte Mitscherlich & Partner, Sonnenstrasse 33
80331 München / DE
Application number, filing date98101177.823.01.1998
[1998/31]
Priority number, dateJP1997001043323.01.1997         Original published format: JP 1043397
JP1997008104731.03.1997         Original published format: JP 8104797
[1998/31]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0855823
Date:29.07.1998
Language:EN
[1998/31]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0855823
Date:12.01.2000
[2000/02]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0855823
Date:01.10.2008
Language:EN
[2008/40]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP01.12.1999
ClassificationInternational:H04M1/72, G08B5/22
[1998/31]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2000/38]
Former [1998/31]AT,  BE,  CH,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Anzeigeverfahren, Anzeigegerät und Kommunikationsverfahren[1998/31]
English:Display method, display apparatus and communication method[1998/31]
French:Méthode d'affichage, dispositif d'affichage et méthode de communication[1998/31]
Examination procedure29.05.2000Examination requested  [2000/30]
11.05.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
08.09.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.12.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
12.04.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.07.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
14.09.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.04.2008Communication of intention to grant the patent
08.08.2008Fee for grant paid
08.08.2008Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)02.07.2009No opposition filed within time limit [2009/37]
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.01.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
11.01.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
14.01.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
14.01.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
14.01.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
12.01.2005Renewal fee patent year 08
12.01.2006Renewal fee patent year 09
12.01.2007Renewal fee patent year 10
14.01.2008Renewal fee patent year 11
31.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 12
Documents cited:Search[Y]US5406268  (FULLMER HOWARD K [US]) [Y] 1,6,7,12-14,20,23 * column W *;
 [Y]EP0686949  (CASIO COMPUTER CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 1,6,7,12-14,20,23 * figures 4-101 *;
 [A]US4642710  (MURTHA EUGENE A [US], et al) [A] 1,7,14 * column W *;
 [PA]GB2314184  (NEC CORP [JP]) [PA] 1,7,14 * the whole document *