Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0855275

EP0855275 - Ink-jet recording head [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  25.07.2003
Database last updated on 18.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip25.07.2003No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 10.09.2003  [2003/37]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Seiko Epson Corporation
4-1, Nishishinjuku 2-chome Shinjuku-ku
Tokyo / JP
[N/P]
Former [1998/31]For all designated states
SEIKO EPSON CORPORATION
4-1, Nishishinjuku 2-chome
Shinjuku-ku Tokyo / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Kitahara, Tsuyoshi
c/o Seiko Epson Corporation, 3-5, Owa 3-chome
Suwa-shi, Nagano / JP
 [2001/10]
Former [1998/31]01 / Xitahara, Tsuyoshi
c/o Seiko Epson Corporation, 3-5, Owa 3-chome
Suwa-shi, Nagano / JP
Representative(s)Diehl, Hermann O. Th. , et al
Diehl & Partner GbR
Augustenstrasse 46
80333 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1998/31]Diehl, Hermann, Dr. Dipl.-Phys. , et al
DIEHL, GLÄSER, HILTL & PARTNER Patentanwälte Flüggenstrasse 13
80639 München / DE
Application number, filing date98101308.926.01.1998
[1998/31]
Priority number, dateJP1997002607524.01.1997         Original published format: JP 2607597
JP1997036364916.12.1997         Original published format: JP 36364997
[1998/31]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0855275
Date:29.07.1998
Language:EN
[1998/31]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0855275
Date:02.06.1999
[1999/22]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0855275
Date:18.09.2002
Language:EN
[2002/38]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP20.04.1999
ClassificationInternational:B41J2/14
[1998/31]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL [2000/07]
Former [1998/31]AT,  BE,  CH,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Tintenstrahlaufzeichnungskopf[1998/31]
English:Ink-jet recording head[1998/31]
French:Tête d'enregistrement à jet d'encre[1998/31]
Examination procedure23.08.1999Examination requested  [1999/42]
21.02.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
29.06.2000Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.01.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
04.04.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
25.06.2002Fee for grant paid
25.06.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)19.06.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/37]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.01.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
30.01.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
31.01.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[YA]JPS61193859  ;
 [Y]EP0726151  (TEKTRONIX INC [US]) [Y] 1,2,8 * figure 1 *;
 [A]JPS57159658  ;
 [A]JPS63162252  ;
 [A]JPS6381049  ;
 [A]JPH04216939  ;
 [E]EP0897801  (SEIKO EPSON CORP [JP]) [E] 1-4,7,9,11-14,17 * column 1, line 49 - line 51; figures 7A,7B,13 * * column 7, line 1 - line 13 * * column 7, line 27 - line 32 * * column 8, line 9 - line 10 *
 [YA]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19870121), vol. 011, no. 021, Database accession no. (M - 555), [Y] 1,2,8 * abstract * [A] 9,12,18
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19821225), vol. 006, no. 267, Database accession no. (M - 182), [A] 1-3,8-10,15,18 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19881111), vol. 012, no. 428, Database accession no. (M - 762), [A] 1,8,9,18 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19880819), vol. 012, no. 305, Database accession no. (M - 733), [A] 1,2,8,9,18 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19921204), vol. 016, no. 563, Database accession no. (M - 1342), [A] 1,9 * abstract *