Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0863588

EP0863588 - Laseroptics and laserdiode [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  17.09.2004
Database last updated on 18.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip17.09.2004No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 03.11.2004  [2004/45]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Laserline Gesellschaft für Entwicklung und Vertrieb von Diodenlasern GmbH
Maria Trost 23
56070 Koblenz / DE
[N/P]
Former [1998/37]For all designated states
Laserline Gesellschaft für Entwicklung und Vertrieb von Diodenlasern GmbH
Maria Trost 23
56070 Koblenz / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Krause, Volker
Kupferbergstrasse 4
67292 Kirchheimbolanden / DE
02 / Ullmann, Christoph Dr.
Pfarrer Hambüchenweg 11
53639 Königswinter / DE
[1998/37]
Representative(s)Graf, Helmut , et al
Graf Glück Habersack Kritzenberger
Postfach 10 08 26
93008 Regensburg / DE
[N/P]
Former [1998/37]Graf, Helmut, Dipl.-Ing. , et al
Postfach 10 08 26
93008 Regensburg / DE
Application number, filing date98101690.002.02.1998
[1998/37]
Priority number, dateDE199710382501.02.1997         Original published format: DE 19703825
DE199710557414.02.1997         Original published format: DE 19705574
[1998/37]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0863588
Date:09.09.1998
Language:DE
[1998/37]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0863588
Date:02.02.2000
[2000/05]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0863588
Date:12.11.2003
Language:DE
[2003/46]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP20.12.1999
ClassificationInternational:H01S3/00, H01S5/00, G02B27/09
[2003/17]
Former International [2000/05]H01S3/00, G02B27/09
Former International [1998/37]H01S3/00
Designated contracting statesCH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   LI [2000/41]
Former [1998/37]AT,  BE,  CH,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Laseroptik sowie Diodenlaser[1998/37]
English:Laseroptics and laserdiode[1998/37]
French:Optique pour laser et laser à diode[1998/37]
Examination procedure23.03.2000Examination requested  [2000/20]
03.08.2000Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
15.11.2000Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE
26.05.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
02.07.2003Fee for grant paid
02.07.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)13.08.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/45]
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.02.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
19.02.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
04.03.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
19.02.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
01.09.2000AT   M01   Not yet paid
01.09.2000BE   M01   Not yet paid
01.09.2000DK   M01   Not yet paid
01.09.2000ES   M01   Not yet paid
01.09.2000FI   M01   Not yet paid
01.09.2000GR   M01   Not yet paid
01.09.2000IE   M01   Not yet paid
01.09.2000IT   M01   Not yet paid
01.09.2000LU   M01   Not yet paid
01.09.2000MC   M01   Not yet paid
01.09.2000NL   M01   Not yet paid
01.09.2000PT   M01   Not yet paid
01.09.2000SE   M01   Not yet paid
Additional fee for renewal fee
28.02.200205   M06   Fee paid on   26.03.2002
Documents cited:Search[A]GB387803  (RICHARD EDMUND REASON, et al) [A] 1 * the whole document *;
 [A]DE19514626  (FRAUNHOFER GES FORSCHUNG [DE]) [A] 1 * column 11, line 65 - column 12, line 68; figure 2 *;
 [DA]DE4438368  (FRAUNHOFER GES FORSCHUNG [DE]) [DA] 1 * the whole document *;
 [A]US5513201  (YAMAGUCHI SATOSHI [JP], et al) [A] 1 * figures 16,30,32,41 *;
 [E]DE19743322  (SHOWA OPTRONIC CO [JP]) [E] 1-22 * the whole document *;
 [E]GB2319630  (BECKMANN LEO HEINRICH JOSEF FR [NL]) [E] 1 * figures 1,4 *