Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0859001

EP0859001 - Preparation of oxazole derivatives [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  11.10.2002
Database last updated on 14.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip11.10.2002No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 27.11.2002  [2002/48]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
F. Hoffmann-La Roche AG
4070 Basel / CH
[N/P]
Former [1998/34]For all designated states
F. HOFFMANN-LA ROCHE AG
4070 Basel / CH
Inventor(s)01 / Behringer, Klaus
45 Froburgstrasse
4052 Basel / CH
02 / Bonrath, Werner
40 Haslacherstrasse
79115 Freiburg / DE
03 / Pauling, Horst
39 Ruchholzstrasse
4103 Bottmingen / CH
[1998/34]
Representative(s)Kellenberger, Marcus , et al
F.Hoffmann-La Roche AG Patent Department (PLP), 124 Grenzacherstrasse
4070 Basel / CH
[N/P]
Former [1998/34]Kellenberger, Marcus, Dr. , et al
F.Hoffmann-La Roche AG Patent Department (PLP), 124 Grenzacherstrasse
4070 Basel / CH
Application number, filing date98101934.205.02.1998
[1998/34]
Priority number, dateEP1997010233913.02.1997         Original published format: EP 97102339
[1998/34]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0859001
Date:19.08.1998
Language:DE
[1998/34]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0859001
Date:05.12.2001
Language:DE
[2001/49]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.06.1998
ClassificationInternational:C07D263/34
[1998/34]
Designated contracting statesBE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IE,   IT,   LI,   NL,   SE [1999/18]
Former [1998/34]AT,  BE,  CH,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Herstellung von Oxazolderivaten[1998/34]
English:Preparation of oxazole derivatives[1998/34]
French:Préparation de dérivés d'oxazole[1998/34]
Examination procedure10.02.1999Examination requested  [1999/14]
18.02.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
24.05.2000Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.02.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
07.06.2001Communication of intention to grant the patent
24.08.2001Fee for grant paid
24.08.2001Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)06.09.2002No opposition filed within time limit [2002/48]
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.02.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
15.02.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[AD]EP0492233  (HOFFMANN LA ROCHE [CH]) [AD] 1-3,6 * example -; claims 1-3 *;
 [AP]EP0770604  (HOFFMANN LA ROCHE [CH]) [AP] 1-7 * example .; claims 1-3,6 *;
 [A]EP0612736  (HOFFMANN LA ROCHE [CH]) [A] 1-3,6,7 * example .; claims 1-3,5 *;
 [AD]US3222374  (OSWALD CHASE GEORGE) [AD] 1-3,5 * example 1; claim 1 *;
 [AD]EP0010697  (HOFFMANN LA ROCHE [CH]) [AD] 1,2 * example -; claim 1 *;
 [AD]US4026901  (COFFEN DAVID LLEWELLYN) [AD] 1 * claim 1 *
 [AD]  T. RINDERSPACHER ET AL., HELVETICA CHIMICA ACTA, (1960), vol. 43, no. 6, pages 1522 - 30, XP002065042 [AD] 1,2 * Seite 1523, Reaktionsschema; Seite 1527, Zeilen 26-29 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/hlca.19600430610