Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0857966

EP0857966 - Gas sensor [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  06.08.2010
Database last updated on 17.11.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip10.06.2011Lapse of the patent in a contracting statepublished on 13.07.2011  [2011/28]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
NGK Spark Plug Co., Ltd.
14-18, Takatsuji-cho Mizuho-ku Nagoya-shi
Aichi 467-0872 / JP
[2009/40]
Former [1998/33]For all designated states
NGK SPARK PLUG CO., LTD.
14-18, Takatsuji-cho Mizuho-ku
Nagoya-shi, Aichi 467-0872 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Tsuzuki, Masashi
c/o NGK Spark Plug Co., Ltd. 14-18, Takatsuji-cho
Mizuho-ku, Nagoya-shi, Aichi 467-0872 / JP
02 / Kawai, Takeshi
c/o NGK Spark Plug Co., Ltd. 14-18, Takatsuji-cho
Mizuho-ku, Nagoya-shi, Aichi 467-0872 / JP
[1998/33]
Representative(s)Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstrasse 4
80802 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1998/33]Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät
Maximilianstrasse 58
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date98102026.605.02.1998
[1998/33]
Priority number, dateJP1997002390806.02.1997         Original published format: JP 2390897
[1998/33]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0857966
Date:12.08.1998
Language:EN
[1998/33]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0857966
Date:19.07.2000
[2000/29]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0857966
Date:30.09.2009
Language:EN
[2009/40]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP05.06.2000
ClassificationInternational:G01N27/407
[1998/33]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2001/13]
Former [1998/33]AT,  BE,  CH,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Gassensor[1998/33]
English:Gas sensor[1998/33]
French:Capteur de gaz[1998/33]
Examination procedure18.09.2000Examination requested  [2000/46]
20.01.2001Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
07.05.2001Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE
02.08.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
11.12.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.10.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
14.02.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.12.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
28.01.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.02.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
20.03.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.04.2009Communication of intention to grant the patent
13.08.2009Fee for grant paid
13.08.2009Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)01.07.2010No opposition filed within time limit [2010/36]
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.02.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
28.02.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
27.02.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
27.02.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
20.02.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
25.02.2005Renewal fee patent year 08
23.02.2006Renewal fee patent year 09
27.02.2007Renewal fee patent year 10
28.02.2008Renewal fee patent year 11
28.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 12
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
14.02.2001AT   M01   Not yet paid
14.02.2001BE   M01   Not yet paid
14.02.2001CH   M01   Not yet paid
14.02.2001DK   M01   Not yet paid
14.02.2001ES   M01   Not yet paid
14.02.2001FI   M01   Not yet paid
14.02.2001GR   M01   Not yet paid
14.02.2001IE   M01   Not yet paid
14.02.2001LU   M01   Not yet paid
14.02.2001MC   M01   Not yet paid
14.02.2001NL   M01   Not yet paid
14.02.2001PT   M01   Not yet paid
14.02.2001SE   M01   Not yet paid
Lapses during opposition  TooltipIT30.09.2009
GB05.02.2010
[2011/28]
Documents cited:Search[A]US4177112  (NAKAMURA YASUO [JP], et al) [A] 1-10 * abstract * * column 1, line 5 - line 42; figure 1 *;
 [A]DE4342064  (NIPPON DENSO CO [JP]) [A] 1-10 * abstract * * page 1, line 1 - line 51; figure 1 *;
 [A]EP0740150  (NGK SPARK PLUG CO [JP]) [A] 1-10 * column 4, line 51 - line 53; figure 1 *
ExaminationUS5344549