EP0871274 - Charging device adapted for charging NiMeH batteries [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.09.2003 Database last updated on 22.04.2025 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.03.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): DK | published on 25.04.2007 [2007/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VARTA Microbattery GmbH Am Leineufer 51 30419 Hannover / DE | [2003/02] |
Former [2002/03] | For all designated states Microbatterie GmbH Am Leineufer 51 30419 Hannover / DE | ||
Former [2000/19] | For all designated states VARTA Gerätebatterie GmbH Am Leineufer 51 30419 Hannover / DE | ||
Former [1998/42] | For all designated states VARTA Batterie Aktiengesellschaft Am Leineufer 51 30419 Hannover / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Knop, Ingmar Anton-Hengele-Strasse 8 73433 Aaalen / DE | [1998/42] | Representative(s) | Patentanwälte Ruff, Wilhelm, Beier, Dauster & Partner mbB Kronenstrasse 30 70174 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/37] | Patentanwälte Ruff, Wilhelm, Beier, Dauster & Partner Kronenstrasse 30 70174 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [1998/42] | Kaiser, Dieter Ralf, Dipl.-Ing. Gundelhardtstrasse 72 65779 Kelkheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 98102036.5 | 06.02.1998 | [1998/42] | Priority number, date | DE1997206354U | 10.04.1997 Original published format: DE 29706354 U | [1998/42] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0871274 | Date: | 14.10.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0871274 | Date: | 20.11.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.06.1998 | Classification | IPC: | H02J7/00, H02J7/02 | [1998/42] | CPC: |
H02J7/0034 (EP,US);
H01M10/44 (EP);
H02J7/00038 (EP);
H02J7/00047 (EP);
H01M50/574 (EP,US);
Y02E60/10 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, IE, IT, LI, NL, PT, SE [1999/25] |
Former [1998/42] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Angepasstes Ladegerät für NiMeH-Batterien | [1998/42] | English: | Charging device adapted for charging NiMeH batteries | [1998/42] | French: | Dispositif de charge adapté pour charger de batteries NiMeH | [1998/42] | Examination procedure | 21.08.1998 | Examination requested [1998/43] | 15.04.1999 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 30.07.1999 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) GR, LU, MC | 21.09.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.12.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.08.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 07.02.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination {1} | 22.03.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.06.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 03.06.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.08.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/46] | Request for further processing for: | 21.02.2002 | Request for further processing filed | 04.03.2002 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 08.04.2002 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 17.05.1999 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 17.05.1999 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 17.05.1999 | MC   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FI | 20.11.2002 | IE | 20.11.2002 | AT | 06.02.2003 | DK | 20.02.2003 | PT | 20.02.2003 | SE | 20.02.2003 | BE | 28.02.2003 | CH | 28.02.2003 | LI | 28.02.2003 | ES | 29.05.2003 | [2007/17] |
Former [2004/31] | FI | 20.11.2002 | |
IE | 20.11.2002 | ||
AT | 06.02.2003 | ||
PT | 20.02.2003 | ||
SE | 20.02.2003 | ||
BE | 28.02.2003 | ||
CH | 28.02.2003 | ||
LI | 28.02.2003 | ||
ES | 29.05.2003 | ||
Former [2004/28] | FI | 20.11.2002 | |
IE | 20.11.2002 | ||
PT | 20.02.2003 | ||
SE | 20.02.2003 | ||
BE | 28.02.2003 | ||
CH | 28.02.2003 | ||
LI | 28.02.2003 | ||
ES | 29.05.2003 | ||
Former [2004/04] | FI | 20.11.2002 | |
IE | 20.11.2002 | ||
PT | 20.02.2003 | ||
SE | 20.02.2003 | ||
CH | 28.02.2003 | ||
LI | 28.02.2003 | ||
ES | 29.05.2003 | ||
Former [2004/01] | FI | 20.11.2002 | |
IE | 20.11.2002 | ||
PT | 20.02.2003 | ||
SE | 20.02.2003 | ||
CH | 28.02.2003 | ||
LI | 28.02.2003 | ||
Former [2003/43] | FI | 20.11.2002 | |
IE | 20.11.2002 | ||
PT | 20.02.2003 | ||
SE | 20.02.2003 | ||
Former [2003/42] | IE | 20.11.2002 | |
PT | 20.02.2003 | ||
SE | 20.02.2003 | ||
Former [2003/29] | PT | 20.02.2003 | |
SE | 20.02.2003 | ||
Former [2003/19] | SE | 20.02.2003 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2710662 (MAACK ELMEWE) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]US4422031 (VIGERSTOL OLE K [AU]) [A] 1* column W *; | [A]US4775826 (KLEMA GORDON L [US]) [A] 1 * column W *; | [A]DE19532013 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 1 * the whole document * |