blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0949057 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0949057



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 105
04.03.2013 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant Search / examination 1
07.11.2000 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
25.11.1999 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
03.11.1999 General enquiry Search / examination 1
06.09.1999 Letter concerning the designation and/or extension and/or validation of states Search / examination 1
02.09.1999 Letter concerning the designation and/or extension and/or validation of states Search / examination 1
03.08.1999 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
03.08.1999 Translation of the claims Search / examination 3
03.08.1999 Translation of the claims Search / examination 3
28.07.1999 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 1
27.07.1999 Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant Search / examination 4
08.07.1999 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 3
24.06.1999 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 4
24.06.1999 Text intended for grant Search / examination 16
28.05.1999 Documents for grant of a patent Search / examination 2
28.01.1999 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
06.11.1998 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 2
06.11.1998 Claims Search / examination 3
06.11.1998 Description Search / examination 3
31.07.1998 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
31.07.1998 European search report Search / examination 3
22.05.1998 Letter concerning the inventor Search / examination 2
11.02.1998 Abstract Search / examination 1
11.02.1998 Claims Search / examination 3
11.02.1998 Description Search / examination 6
11.02.1998 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
11.02.1998 Drawings Search / examination 6
11.02.1998 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 2
11.02.1998 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 6
06.02.1998 Drawings Search / examination 6
06.02.1998 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 6
06.02.1998 Specification filed by fax and/or in non-official language Search / examination 10