blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP0949057


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
03.11.2000 No opposition filed within time limit published on  20.12.2000 [2000/51]
04.07.2000 Change - extension states
12.05.2000 Definitive list of designations published on  28.06.2000 [2000/26]
19.11.1999 (Expected) grant published on  05.01.2000 [2000/01]
27.08.1999 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  13.10.1999 [1999/41]
27.08.1999 Request for examination filed published on  13.10.1999 [1999/41]
18.08.1999 Communication of intention to grant a patent
22.07.1999 Communication of intention to grant
22.07.1999 Communication of intention to grant a patent
18.06.1999 Communication of intention to grant
18.06.1999 Request for accelerated examination
21.04.1998 Request for accelerated examination