blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP0949057
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
EP0949057Global Dossier 05.01.2000B1
EP0949057 13.10.1999A1
Priority number Date
EP98102043 06.02.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
AT188419T 15.01.2000T
Priority number Date
EP98102043 06.02.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
DE59800075D 10.02.2000D1
Priority number Date
EP98102043 06.02.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
DK0949057T 19.06.2000T3
Priority number Date
EP98102043 06.02.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
US6170550 09.01.2001B1
Priority number Date
EP98102043 06.02.1998