blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Legal status: EP0949057

Designated contracting states AT 
 BE 
 CH 
 DE 
 DK 
 FR 
 GB 
 LI 
 NL 
 SE 
Examination procedure04.08.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
European patent granted05.01.2000
Opposition procedure06.10.2000No opposition filed within time limit published on 13.12.2000 
INPADOC data   TooltipThe EPO does not accept any responsibility for the accuracy of legal status data relating to the post-grant phase, including but not limited to their completeness and fitness for specific purposes, nor can it guarantee that such data are up to date. For authoritative information, please refer to the relevant national patent authority.
Event date:13.10.1999 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:A1
Designated State(s):AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE
 
Event date:13.10.1999 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:
Free Format Text:AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI
 
Event date:13.10.1999 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED
Effective DATE:19981106
 
Event date:05.01.2000 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:B1
Designated State(s):AT BE CH DE DK FR GB LI NL SE
 
Event date:05.01.2000 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:
Free Format Text:AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI
 
Event date:05.01.2000 
Event description:CORRESPONDS TO:
Ref Document Number:188419
Country of Ref Document:AT
DATE OF REF DOCUMENT:20000115
Kind Code of Ref Document:T
Format of Ref Document F/P:P
 
Event date:14.01.2000 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG CH EP
Code Expl.:+EUROPEAN PATENT TAKES EFFECT AS A NATIONAL PATENT IN CH/LI
 
Event date:21.01.2000 
Event description:FR: TRANSLATION FILED
 
Event date:02.02.2000 
Event description:GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)
Effective DATE:20000106
 
Event date:10.02.2000 
Event description:CORRESPONDS TO:
Ref Document Number:59800075
Country of Ref Document:DE
DATE OF REF DOCUMENT:20000210
Format of Ref Document F/P:P
 
Event date:19.06.2000 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DK T3
Code Expl.:+EP PATENT WITH DANISH CLAIMS
 
Event date:28.06.2000 
Event description:DESIGNATION FEES PAID
Free Format Text:AT BE CH DE DK FR GB LI NL SE
 
Event date:09.08.2000 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG IE FD4D
Code Expl.:-EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID
 
Event date:20.12.2000 
Event description:NO OPPOSITION FILED
 
Event date:01.01.2002 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG GB IF02
Code Expl.:+EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01
 
Event date:29.11.2002 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG CH NV
Code Expl.: NEW AGENT
Representatives Name:ABACUS PATENTANWAELTE KLOCKE SPAETH BARTH
 
Event date:15.05.2008 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG CH PFA
Code Expl.: NAME/FIRM CHANGED
Owner Name:LEISTER PROCESS TECHNOLOGIES
Free Format Text:LEISTER PROCESS TECHNOLOGIES#RIEDSTRASSE#6060 SARNEN (CH) -TRANSFER TO- LEISTER PROCESS TECHNOLOGIES#GALILEOSTRASSE 10#6056 KAEGISWIL (CH)
 
Event date:30.01.2012 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R082 59800075 DE
Code Expl.: CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE
Representatives Name:ABACUS PATENTANWAELTE, KLOCKE, SPAETH, BARTH, DE
 
Event date:14.03.2012 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG NL SD
Code Expl.: ASSIGNMENTS OF PATENTS
Effective DATE:20120307
 
Event date:15.03.2012 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG CH PUE
Code Expl.: ASSIGNMENT
Owner Name:LEISTER TECHNOLOGIES AG
Free Format Text:LEISTER PROCESS TECHNOLOGIES#GALILEOSTRASSE 10#6056 KAEGISWIL (CH) -TRANSFER TO- LEISTER TECHNOLOGIES AG#GALILEO-STRASSE 10#6056 KAEGISWIL (CH)
 
Event date:22.03.2012 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R082 59800075 DE
Code Expl.: CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE
Representatives Name:ABACUS PATENTANWAELTE, DE
Effective DATE:20120130
 
Event date:22.03.2012 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R081 59800075 DE
Code Expl.: CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE
Owner Name:LEISTER TECHNOLOGIES AG, CH
Free Format Text:FORMER OWNER: LEISTER PROCESS TECHNOLOGIES, KAEGISWIL, CH
Effective DATE:20120130
 
Event date:04.05.2012 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR CA
Code Expl.: CHANGE OF ADDRESS
Effective DATE:20120330
 
Event date:04.05.2012 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR TP
Code Expl.: TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY
Owner Name:LEISTER TECHNOLOGIES AG, CH
Effective DATE:20120330
 
Event date:22.08.2012 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG GB 732E
Code Expl.: AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)
Free Format Text:REGISTERED BETWEEN 20120726 AND 20120801
 
Event date:15.10.2012 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG AT PC 188419 AT T
Code Expl.: CHANGE OF THE OWNER
Owner Name:LEISTER TECHNOLOGIES AG, CH
Effective DATE:20120913
 
Event date:30.04.2013 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:DK
Payment DATE:20130212
Year of Fee Payment:16
 
Event date:30.04.2013 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:SE
Payment DATE:20130212
Year of Fee Payment:16
 
Event date:31.05.2013 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:BE
Payment DATE:20130212
Year of Fee Payment:16
 
Event date:21.05.2014 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R082 59800075 DE
Code Expl.: CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE
Representatives Name:ABACUS PATENTANWAELTE, DE
 
Event date:31.08.2014 
Event description:BE: LAPSED
Owner Name:*LEISTER TECHNOLOGIES A.G.
Effective DATE:20140228
 
Event date:29.09.2014 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DK EBP
Code Expl.:-EP PATENT LAPSED
Effective DATE:20140228
 
Event date:30.09.2014 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG SE EUG
Code Expl.:-EP PATENT HAS LAPSED
 
Event date:28.11.2014 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:SE
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20140207
 
Event date:30.01.2015 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:DK
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20140228
 
Event date:30.01.2015 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:BE
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20140228
 
Event date:18.02.2016 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR PLFP
Code Expl.:+FEE PAYMENT
Year of Fee Payment:19
 
Event date:17.02.2017 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR PLFP
Code Expl.:+FEE PAYMENT
Year of Fee Payment:20
 
Event date:28.04.2017 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:FR
Payment DATE:20170217
Year of Fee Payment:20
 
Event date:28.04.2017 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:DE
Payment DATE:20170228
Year of Fee Payment:20
 
Event date:31.05.2017 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:NL
Payment DATE:20170216
Year of Fee Payment:20
 
Event date:31.05.2017 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:GB
Payment DATE:20170216
Year of Fee Payment:20
 
Event date:31.05.2017 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:AT
Payment DATE:20170217
Year of Fee Payment:20
 
Event date:31.07.2017 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:CH
Payment DATE:20170526
Year of Fee Payment:20
 
Event date:06.02.2018 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R071 59800075 DE
Code Expl.:-EXPIRY OF RIGHT
 
Event date:07.02.2018 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG NL MK
Code Expl.:-PATENT EXPIRED BECAUSE OF REACHING THE MAXIMUM LIFETIME OF A PATENT
Effective DATE:20180205
 
Event date:15.02.2018 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG CH PL
Code Expl.:-PATENT CEASED
 
Event date:28.02.2018 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG GB PE20
Code Expl.:-PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS
Expiry DATE:20180205
 
Event date:15.03.2018 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG AT MK07 188419 AT T
Code Expl.:-EXPIRY
Effective DATE:20180206
 
Event date:30.04.2018 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:GB
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION
Effective DATE:20180205