Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0949057

EP0949057 - Pressing element for welding of sealing webs [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  03.11.2000
Database last updated on 14.09.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip03.11.2000No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 20.12.2000 [2000/51]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Leister Process Technologies
Riedstrasse
6060 Sarnen / CH
[1999/41]
Inventor(s)01 / Niederberger, Adolf
Hostettrainstr. 14
6056 Kägiswil / CH
[1999/41]
Representative(s)Klocke, Peter , et al
ABACUS
Patentanwälte
Lise-Meitner-Strasse 21
72202 Nagold / DE
[N/P]
Former [1999/41]Klocke, Peter, Dipl.-Ing. , et al
Klocke - Späth - Neubauer Patentanwälte, Kappelstrasse 8
72160 Horb / DE
Application number, filing date98102043.106.02.1998
[1999/41]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0949057
Date:13.10.1999
Language:DE
[1999/41]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0949057
Date:05.01.2000
Language:DE
[2000/01]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP31.07.1998
ClassificationInternational:B29C65/00
[1999/41]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   FR,   GB,   LI,   NL,   SE [2000/01]
Former [1999/41]AT,  BE,  CH,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Andrückeinrichtung zum Verschweissen von Dichtungsbahnen[1999/41]
English:Pressing element for welding of sealing webs[1999/41]
French:Dispositif de pressage pour le soudage de bandes d'étanchéité[1999/41]
Examination procedure12.02.1998Request for accelerated examination filed
06.11.1998Examination requested  [1999/41]
24.06.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
24.06.1999Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes
27.07.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
04.08.1999Fee for grant paid
04.08.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)06.10.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2000/51]
Documents cited:Search[X]DE9110488U  (KAMINSKI) [X] 1,7 * page 10, paragraph 3; figure 5 *;
 [X]DE9110487U  (KAMINSKI) [X] 1,7 * page 11, paragraph 3; figure 5 *;
 [A]CH507083  (HESSER MASCHINENFABRIK) [A] 1,7 * the whole document *