EP0873933 - Frame construction [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.06.2004 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.06.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.08.2004 [2004/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dr.Ing.h.c. F. Porsche Aktiengesellschaft Porschestrasse 42 70435 Stuttgart / DE | [1998/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Separautzki, Reinhold Im Bornrain 20 71696 Möglingen / DE | [1998/44] | Application number, filing date | 98102061.3 | 06.02.1998 | [1998/44] | Priority number, date | DE1997116865 | 22.04.1997 Original published format: DE 19716865 | [1998/44] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0873933 | Date: | 28.10.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/44] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0873933 | Date: | 21.02.2001 | [2001/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0873933 | Date: | 13.08.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.01.2001 | Classification | IPC: | B62D29/00, B62D23/00, B62D27/02 | [1998/44] | CPC: |
B62D29/008 (EP,KR,US);
B62D29/007 (KR);
B62D23/005 (EP,US);
B62D27/023 (EP,US);
F16B2200/67 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49622 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49623 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49805 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49906 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49956 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2001/46] |
Former [1998/44] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Rahmenkonstruktion | [1998/44] | English: | Frame construction | [1998/44] | French: | Structure de cadre | [1998/44] | Examination procedure | 21.08.2001 | Examination requested [2001/42] | 24.01.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.06.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 03.06.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.05.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.01.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3460235 (ROBERTS THOMAS MARMADUKE, et al) [A] 1 * column 2, line 45 - line 70; figure - *; | [A]US4542846 (MATSUI SHIGETOMO [JP], et al) [A] 1 * column 7, line 36 - column 8, line 23; figures 9,10 *; | [A]WO9404766 (SCHNEIDER GESENKSCHMIEDE [DE], et al) [A] 1* page 8, paragraph 5; figure 3 *; | [A]US5474331 (BOOHER HOWARD [US]) [A] 1 * column 3, line 42 - line 59; figures 7-9 * | by applicant | DE19506160 |