Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0860223

EP0860223 - Pressing device for connecting workpieces [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  11.10.2002
Database last updated on 08.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip11.10.2002No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 27.11.2002  [2002/48]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Novopress GmbH Pressen und Presswerkzeuge & Co. KG
Scharnhorststrasse 1
41460 Neuss / DE
[N/P]
Former [1998/35]For all designated states
NOVOPRESS GMBH PRESSEN UND PRESSWERKZEUGE & CO. KG.
Scharnhorststrasse 1
41460 Neuss / DE
Inventor(s)01 / The inventor has agreed to waive his entitlement to designation.
02 / The inventor has agreed to waive his entitlement to designation.
[1998/35]
Representative(s)dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB
Deichmannhaus am Dom
Bahnhofsvorplatz 1
50667 Köln / DE
[N/P]
Former [1998/35]Paul, Dieter-Alfred, Dipl.-Ing. , et al
Fichtestrasse 18
41464 Neuss / DE
Application number, filing date98102326.011.02.1998
[1998/35]
Priority number, dateDE1997203052U21.02.1997         Original published format: DE 29703052 U
[1998/35]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0860223
Date:26.08.1998
Language:DE
[1998/35]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0860223
Date:26.07.2000
[2000/30]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0860223
Date:05.12.2001
Language:DE
[2001/49]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP09.06.2000
ClassificationInternational:B21D39/04
[1998/35]
Designated contracting statesCH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI [2001/14]
Former [1998/35]AT,  BE,  CH,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Pressgerät zum Verbinden von Werkstücken[1998/35]
English:Pressing device for connecting workpieces[1998/35]
French:Presse pour connecter des pièces[1998/35]
Examination procedure07.12.2000Examination requested  [2001/11]
27.01.2001Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
25.05.2001Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE
04.07.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
27.09.2001Fee for grant paid
27.09.2001Fee for publishing/printing paid
08.10.2001Communication of intention to grant the patent
Opposition(s)06.09.2002No opposition filed within time limit [2002/48]
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.02.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
13.02.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
21.02.2001AT   M01   Not yet paid
21.02.2001BE   M01   Not yet paid
21.02.2001DK   M01   Not yet paid
21.02.2001ES   M01   Not yet paid
21.02.2001FI   M01   Not yet paid
21.02.2001GR   M01   Not yet paid
21.02.2001IE   M01   Not yet paid
21.02.2001LU   M01   Not yet paid
21.02.2001MC   M01   Not yet paid
21.02.2001NL   M01   Not yet paid
21.02.2001PT   M01   Not yet paid
21.02.2001SE   M01   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]DE29613654U  (BERND RIESTER GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-5 * page 14, line 27 - page 15, line 21; figure -; claim - *;
 [PX]DE29714753U  (NOVOPRESS GMBH [DE]) [PX] 1-5 * the whole document *;
 [DA]EP0451806  (DISCHLER HELMUT [DE]);
 [DA]DE29604276U  (NOVOPRESS GMBH [DE]);
 [DA]DE3423283  (DISCHLER HELMUT);
 [DA]EP0582543  (STEBI TECH AG [CH])