Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0859138

EP0859138 - Engine control system [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  06.08.2004
Database last updated on 17.09.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip17.02.2006Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): FR
published on 05.04.2006  [2006/14]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Mazda Motor Corporation
3-1, Shinchi, Fuchu-cho Aki-gun
Hiroshima 735 / JP
[N/P]
Former [1998/34]For all designated states
Mazda Motor Corporation
3-1, Shinchi, Fuchu-cho
Aki-gun, Hiroshima 735 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Mamiya, Kiyotaka
18-21, Hachihonmatsuminami 4-chome
Higashihiroshima-shi, Hiroshima / JP
02 / Imada, Michihiro
528-7, Umaki 8-chome, Higashi-ku
Hiroshima-shi, Hiroshima / JP
03 / Tetsuno, Masayuki
30-25-302, Yagi 9-chome, Asaminami-ku
Hiroshima-shi, Hiroshima / JP
[1998/34]
Representative(s)Laufhütte, Dieter
Lorenz Seidler Gossel
Rechtsanwälte Patentanwälte
Partnerschaft mbB
Widenmayerstrasse 23
80538 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1998/34]Laufhütte, Dieter, Dr.-Ing.
Lorenz-Seidler-Gossel Widenmayerstrasse 23
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date98102446.612.02.1998
[1998/34]
Priority number, dateJP1997002818812.02.1997         Original published format: JP 2818897
JP1997002818912.02.1997         Original published format: JP 2818997
[1998/34]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0859138
Date:19.08.1998
Language:EN
[1998/34]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0859138
Date:02.02.2000
[2000/05]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0859138
Date:01.10.2003
Language:EN
[2003/40]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.12.1999
ClassificationInternational:F02D11/10, F02D41/12
[1998/34]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2000/41]
Former [1998/34]AT,  BE,  CH,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Regeleinrichtung für eine Brennkraftmaschine[1998/34]
English:Engine control system[1998/34]
French:Système de commande pour un moteur à combustion interne[1998/34]
Examination procedure02.08.2000Examination requested  [2000/39]
29.11.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
20.01.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.04.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
25.07.2003Fee for grant paid
25.07.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)02.07.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/39]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.02.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
26.02.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
28.02.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
27.02.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFR01.10.2003
GB12.02.2004
[2006/14]
Former [2005/01]GB12.02.2004
Documents cited:Search[E]DE19734227  (MITSUBISHI MOTORS CORP [JP]) [E] 1-4,6,7 * column 1, line 53 - column 2, line 29 * * column 8, line 27 - column 16, line 14 * * figures 1-4 *;
 [PX]SE9702887  (MITSUBISHI MOTORS CORP);
 [A]JPH04325742  ;
 [A]DE3644357  (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1 * abstract *;
 [A]WO9636802  (MITSUBISHI MOTORS CORP [JP], et al) [A] 1 * abstract * * figures 27-29 *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19930329), vol. 017, no. 159, Database accession no. (M - 1389), [A] 1,6,7 * abstract *