Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0860236

EP0860236 - Centrifugal polishing machine [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  23.05.2003
Database last updated on 20.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip11.12.2009Change - representativepublished on 13.01.2010  [2010/02]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Gegenheimer, Helmut
Schlossstrasse 6
75210 Keltern-Weiler / DE
[1998/35]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
[1998/35]
Representative(s)Lempert, Jost , et al
LICHTI Patentanwälte
Postfach 41 07 60
76207 Karlsruhe / DE
[N/P]
Former [2010/02]Lempert, Jost , et al
LICHTI Patentanwälte Postfach 41 07 60
76207 Karlsruhe / DE
Former [1998/35]Lempert, Jost, Dipl.-Phys. Dr. rer.nat. , et al
Patentanwälte, Dipl.-Ing. Heiner Lichti, Dipl.-Phys. Dr. rer. nat. Jost Lempert, Dipl.-Ing. Hartmut Lasch, Postfach 41 07 60
76207 Karlsruhe / DE
Application number, filing date98102679.217.02.1998
[1998/35]
Priority number, dateDE1997202859U19.02.1997         Original published format: DE 29702859 U
[1998/35]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0860236
Date:26.08.1998
Language:DE
[1998/35]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0860236
Date:02.02.2000
[2000/05]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0860236
Date:17.07.2002
Language:DE
[2002/29]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP16.12.1999
ClassificationInternational:B24B31/108
[1998/35]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   IT [2000/41]
Former [1998/35]AT,  BE,  CH,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Fliehkraft-Gleitschleifmaschine[1998/35]
English:Centrifugal polishing machine[1998/35]
French:Machine de tribo-finition centrifuge[1998/35]
Examination procedure29.04.2000Examination requested  [2000/26]
13.02.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
14.04.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.05.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
02.08.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.12.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
25.01.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
20.03.2002Fee for grant paid
20.03.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)22.04.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/28]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.01.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
21.02.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
23.02.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[XY]DE4214060  (DANNEMANN PETER [DE]) [X] 1-3,10-12 * column 3, line 7 - line 24; figures 1,2; claims 1,2,7 * [Y] 6-9,13-15;
 [Y]WO9521726  (DREHER MANFRID KG DR ING [DE], et al) [Y] 6,7,13-15 * page 5, paragraph 2 - paragraph 3 * * page 8, paragraph 3 * * figures 2,3 *;
 [D]DE4428817  (DREHER MANFRID KG DR ING [DE]);
 [Y]DE3604619  (SPALECK GMBH MAX [DE]) [Y] 8,9 * column 3, line 7 - line 29; figure 1; claim 5 *