Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0840051

EP0840051 - Hose connecting structure [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  25.01.2002
Database last updated on 08.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip25.01.2002No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 13.03.2002  [2002/11]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
TOKAI RUBBER INDUSTRIES, LTD.
3600, Aza-Utazu Oaza-Kitatoyama Komaki-shi
Aichi-ken / JP
[N/P]
Former [1998/19]For all designated states
TOKAI RUBBER INDUSTRIES, LTD.
3600, Aza-Utazu Oaza-Kitatoyama
Komaki-shi Aichi-ken / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Kawasaki, Minoru, c/o Tokai Rubber Ind. Ltd.
3600, Aza Utazu, Oaza Kitatoyama
Komaki-shi, Aichi-ken / JP
02 / Miyajima, Atsuo, c/o Tokai Rubber Ind. Ltd.
3600, Aza Utazu, Oaza Kitatoyama
Komaki-shi, Aichi-ken / JP
03 / Ichikawa, Hiroyuki, c/o Tokai Rubber Ind. Ltd.
3600, Aza Utazu, Oaza Kitatoyama
Komaki-shi, Aichi-ken / JP
[1998/19]
Representative(s)Pellmann, Hans-Bernd , et al
Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4-6
80336 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1998/19]Pellmann, Hans-Bernd, Dipl.-Ing. , et al
Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4
80336 München / DE
Application number, filing date98102730.328.05.1993
[1998/19]
Priority number, dateJP1992016421829.05.1992         Original published format: JP 16421892
JP1992016410130.05.1992         Original published format: JP 16410192
JP1992016410230.05.1992         Original published format: JP 16410292
JP1992016410330.05.1992         Original published format: JP 16410392
[1998/19]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0840051
Date:06.05.1998
Language:EN
[1998/19]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0840051
Date:01.07.1998
[1998/27]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0840051
Date:21.03.2001
Language:EN
[2001/12]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP15.05.1998
ClassificationInternational:F16L37/084, F16L11/11, F16L25/00
[1998/22]
Former International [1998/19]F16L37/084
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [1998/19]
TitleGerman:Schlauchverbindung[1998/19]
English:Hose connecting structure[1998/19]
French:Raccord de tuyaux souples[1998/19]
Examination procedure08.09.1998Examination requested  [1998/45]
03.11.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
10.03.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.03.1999Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
27.07.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.08.1999Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
11.02.2000Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.05.2000Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
04.07.2000Communication of intention to grant the patent
04.10.2000Fee for grant paid
04.10.2000Fee for publishing/printing paid
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP93108690.4  / EP0573863
Opposition(s)22.12.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2002/11]
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.02.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
20.02.1998Renewal fee patent year 04
20.02.1998Renewal fee patent year 05
20.02.1998Renewal fee patent year 06
31.05.1999Renewal fee patent year 07
29.05.2000Renewal fee patent year 08
Documents cited:Search[YA]EP0002197  (GEORG ROHL LICHTTECHNISCHE SPE [DE]) [Y] 1,10 * page 4, line 20 - page 5, line 2 * * page 6, line 22 - line 24; claim 12 * [A] 3;
 [YA]GB2244774  (ITALIANA SERRATURE TORINO [IT]) [Y] 1,10 * figure 1 * [A] 2-4,9,11-15;
 [A]GB2153028  (RASMUSSEN GMBH) [A] 1-5,10-15 * figure 1 *;
 [A]GB2217419  (RASMUSSEN GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-4,9-15 * figures 1,2 *;
 [A]DE3615904  (RASMUSSEN GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-5,9-15 * figure 1 *;
 [A]EP0223495  (ORBIJET HOLDINGS PTY LTD [ZA]) [A] 1,2,4,5,10 * figure 1 *;
 [A]EP0469949  (HUTCHINSON SA [FR], et al) [A] 1,2,4,5,10-15 * figures 1-3 *;
 [A]EP0459812  (SWAGELOK QUICK CONNECT CO [US]) [A] 1-5,9-15 * figures 2,3 *;
 [A]US4123091  (COSENTINO LOUIS C, et al) [A] 1-5,9-15 * figures 1,3 *;
 [A]US3394954  (SARNS RICHARD N) [A] 1-5,9-15 * figure 1 *;
 [A]EP0435360  (GEN MOTORS CORP [US]) [A] 1,3 * column 1, line 41 - line 46; figure 4 *;
 [A]DE3815168  (RASMUSSEN GMBH [DE]) [A] 6-8 * figure 5 *
ExaminationEP0385465
 GB1036459
 US3838713