Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0874164

EP0874164 - Furniture hinge [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  11.10.2002
Database last updated on 17.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip11.10.2002No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 27.11.2002  [2002/48]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Hettich-ONI GmbH & Co. KG
Industriestrasse 11-13
32602 Vlotho-Exter / DE
[1998/44]
Inventor(s)01 / Schnelle, Manfred
Beerenweg 6
32278 Kirchlengern / DE
[1998/44]
Representative(s)Stracke, Alexander , et al
Loesenbeck - Stracke - Specht - Dantz Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Am Zwinger 2
33602 Bielefeld / DE
[N/P]
Former [1998/44]Stracke, Alexander, Dipl.-Ing. , et al
Jöllenbecker Strasse 164
33613 Bielefeld / DE
Application number, filing date98103243.625.02.1998
[1998/44]
Priority number, dateDE1997207057U21.04.1997         Original published format: DE 29707057 U
[1998/44]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0874164
Date:28.10.1998
Language:DE
[1998/44]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0874164
Date:05.12.2001
Language:DE
[2001/49]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP04.08.1998
ClassificationInternational:F16B12/16, F16B13/12, E05D5/02
[1998/44]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LU,   NL,   SE [1999/27]
Former [1998/44]AT,  BE,  CH,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Möbelschanier[1998/44]
English:Furniture hinge[1998/44]
French:Charnière de meuble[1998/44]
Examination procedure26.11.1998Examination requested  [1999/04]
05.10.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M05)
06.03.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.05.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
07.08.2001Communication of intention to grant the patent
06.10.2001Fee for grant paid
06.10.2001Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)06.09.2002No opposition filed within time limit [2002/48]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.01.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
30.01.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[A]DE2727962  (LAUTENSCHLAEGER KG KARL) [A] 1 * page 10 *;
 [A]EP0373505  (SALICE ARTURO SPA [IT]) [A] 1 * abstract *;
 [A]DE4322473  (HUWIL WERKE GMBH [DE]) [A] 1 * abstract *;
 [A]DE3722292  (SALICE ARTURO SPA [IT]) [A] 1 * abstract *