EP0850662 - Ventricular capture detection and threshold-seeking pacemaker [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1998/27] | Atrial and ventricular capture detection and threshold-seeking pacemaker | ||
[2002/27] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.04.2004 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.04.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 09.06.2004 [2004/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Medtronic, Inc. 7000 Central Avenue N.E. Minneapolis MN 55432-3576 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1998/27] | For all designated states MEDTRONIC, INC. 7000 Central Avenue N.E. Minneapolis, Minnesota 55432 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Markowitz, Toby H. 1670 Ridgewood Lane South Roseville, Minnesota 55113 / US | 02 /
Strobel, John C. 9125 Tyler Street Northeast Blaine, Minnesota 55434 / US | 03 /
Zhou, Ren 2741 Ardan Avenue Mounds View, Minnesota 55112 / US | 04 /
Rueter, John 4824 Kent Drive Shoreview, Minnesota 55112 / US | [1998/27] | Representative(s) | Hughes, Andrea Michelle Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1998/27] | Hughes, Andrea Michelle Frank B. Dehn & Co., European Patent Attorneys, 179 Queen Victoria Street London EC4V 4EL / GB | Application number, filing date | 98103448.1 | 31.07.1995 | [1998/27] | Priority number, date | US19940291304 | 16.08.1994 Original published format: US 291304 | [1998/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0850662 | Date: | 01.07.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/27] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0850662 | Date: | 29.07.1998 | [1998/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0850662 | Date: | 18.06.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.06.1998 | Classification | IPC: | A61N1/37 | [1998/27] | CPC: |
A61N1/3712 (EP,US);
A61N1/368 (EP,US);
A61N1/3714 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, NL, SE [1998/27] | Title | German: | Herzschrittmacher mit Detektion einer erfolgreichen Stimulation des Ventrikel und Suche nach dem Stimulation-Schwellenwert | [2002/27] | English: | Ventricular capture detection and threshold-seeking pacemaker | [2002/27] | French: | Stimulateur cardiaque avec détection de la capture ventriculaire et recherche de seuil de stimulation | [2002/27] |
Former [1998/27] | Vorhof- und Herzkammererfassung und schwellenwerteinstellender Herzschriffmacher | ||
Former [1998/27] | Atrial and ventricular capture detection and threshold-seeking pacemaker | ||
Former [1998/27] | Détection de la capture auriculaire et ventriculaire et stimulateur à recherche de seuil | Examination procedure | 06.10.1998 | Examination requested [1998/49] | 18.06.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 13.12.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.03.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 17.03.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP95928207.0 / EP0776233 | Opposition(s) | 19.03.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.03.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.03.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.03.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0399063 (SIEMENS ELEMA AB [SE], et al) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]WO9412237 (SIEMENS PACESETTER [US]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]US4554922 (PRYSTOWSKY ERIC N [US], et al) [A] 1 * claim 1 *; | [A]WO8203786 (BIOTRONIK MESS & THERAPIEG [DE], et al) [A] 1 * abstract * * page 43, line 15 - line 27 *; | [A]US4686988 (SHOLDER JASON A [US]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]US4729376 (DECOTE JR ROBERT [US]) [A] 1 * claim 1 *; | [A]EP0110612 (INTERMEDICS INC [US]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]EP0590276 (SIEMENS ELEMA AB [SE]) [A] 1 * abstract * |