Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0861967

EP0861967 - Mobile working apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  18.07.2003
Database last updated on 20.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip18.07.2003Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 03.09.2003  [2003/36]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
DELMAG MASCHINENFABRIK REINHOLD DORNFELD GMBH & CO. i.K.
Max-Planck-Strasse
73730 Esslingen / DE
[N/P]
Former [1998/36]For all designated states
DELMAG MASCHINENFABRIK REINHOLD DORNFELD GMBH & CO.
Max-Planck-Strasse
73730 Esslingen / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Nikodemus, Heinz
Gemeindeländerweg 37/1
73095 Albershausen / DE
02 / Scheid, Winfried
Ringweg 14
73061 Ebersbach / DE
[1998/36]
Representative(s)Ostertag, Reinhard
Ostertag & Partner
Patentanwälte mbB
Epplestrasse 14
70597 Stuttgart / DE
[N/P]
Former [1998/36]Ostertag, Reinhard
Patentanwälte Dr. Ulrich Ostertag Dr. Reinhard Ostertag Eibenweg 10
70597 Stuttgart / DE
Application number, filing date98103486.127.02.1998
[1998/36]
Priority number, dateDE199710831601.03.1997         Original published format: DE 19708316
[1998/36]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0861967
Date:02.09.1998
Language:DE
[1998/36]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0861967
Date:09.02.2000
[2000/06]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP23.12.1999
ClassificationInternational:E21B15/04, E21B15/00
[2000/05]
Former International [1998/36]E21B15/04
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FI,   IT,   NL [2000/42]
Former [1998/36]AT,  BE,  CH,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Fahrbares Arbeitsgerät[1998/36]
English:Mobile working apparatus[1998/36]
French:Appareil de travail mobile[1998/36]
Examination procedure18.03.2000Examination requested  [2000/20]
10.08.2000Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
24.11.2000Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, DK, FR, GB, GR, IE, LI, LU, MC, PT, SE
14.10.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
25.02.2003Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2003/36]
31.03.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2003/36]
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.02.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
17.02.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
22.02.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
08.09.2000AT   M01   Not yet paid
08.09.2000BE   M01   Not yet paid
08.09.2000CH   M01   Not yet paid
08.09.2000DK   M01   Not yet paid
08.09.2000FR   M01   Not yet paid
08.09.2000GB   M01   Not yet paid
08.09.2000GR   M01   Not yet paid
08.09.2000IE   M01   Not yet paid
08.09.2000LU   M01   Not yet paid
08.09.2000MC   M01   Not yet paid
08.09.2000PT   M01   Not yet paid
08.09.2000SE   M01   Not yet paid
Additional fee for renewal fee
28.02.200306   M06   Not yet paid
Stay/Interruption19.12.1998Resumption of proceedings
01.07.1998Interruption of proceedings, reason: legal prevention of applicant
[1998/48]
Documents cited:Search[A]US3205627  (LASZLO GYONGYOSI) [A] 1-12 * column 2, line 25 - line 44 *;
 [A]GB899518  (ATLAS COPCO AB) [A] 1-12 * page 2, line 42 - line 49 * * page 3, line 29 - line 35 *;
 [A]DE4208245  (SCHAEFF KARL GMBH & CO [DE]) [A] 1-12 * column 1, line 20 - line 48 * * column 4, line 32 - line 41 * * figure 2 *;
 [A]DE19512109  (DELMAG MASCHINENFABRIK [DE]) [A] 1-12 * column 4, line 44 - line 52 *;
 [A]AU1042392  (FRANKIPILE AUSTRALIA PTY LTD) [A] 1-12 * page 7, line 13 - line 19 * * figure 1 *
by applicantDE4231553