Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0865137

EP0865137 - Method of controlling the closing procedure of closable devices with at least one part driven by an electric motor [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent maintained as amended
Status updated on  27.10.2006
Database last updated on 23.10.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip27.10.2006Patent maintained (B2 publication)published on 29.11.2006  [2006/48]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Conti Temic Microelectronic GmbH
Sieboldstrasse 19
90411 Nürnberg / DE
[N/P]
Former [2006/48]For all designated states
Conti Temic microelectronic GmbH
Sieboldstrasse 19
90411 Nürnberg / DE
Former [2001/42]For all designated states
Conti Temic microelectronic GmbH
Sieboldstrasse 19
90411 Nürnberg / DE
Former [2000/15]For all designated states
TEMIC TELEFUNKEN microelectronic GmbH
Sieboldstrasse 19
90411 Nürnberg / DE
Former [1998/38]For all designated states
TEMIC TELEFUNKEN microelectronic GmbH
Theresienstrasse 2
74072 Heilbronn / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Driendl, Dieter
Am Dürrenbach 12
88693 Untersiggingen / DE
02 / Kessler, Erwin
Im Hasenöschle 8
88348 Saulgau / DE
03 / Kleiner, Kurt
Gutenbergstrasse 6
88605 Messkirch / DE
04 / Schulter, Wolfgang, Dr.
Kronenstrasse 7
88709 Meersburg / DE
[1998/38]
Representative(s)Bucher, Ralf Christian , et al
Arth, Bucher & Kollegen
Patentanwälte
Alte Landstrasse 23
85521 Ottobrunn / DE
[N/P]
Former [2006/25]Bucher, Ralf Christian , et al
Arth, Bucher & Kollegen, Patentanwälte, Alte Landstrasse 23
85521 Ottobrunn / DE
Former [2003/22](deleted)
...
Former [1998/38]Maute, Hans-Jürgen, Dipl.-Ing.
Daimler-Benz Aktiengesellschaft, FTP/H, Postfach 35 35
74025 Heilbronn / DE
Application number, filing date98103677.503.03.1998
[1998/38]
Priority number, dateDE199711033813.03.1997         Original published format: DE 19710338
[1998/38]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0865137
Date:16.09.1998
Language:DE
[1998/38]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0865137
Date:24.05.2000
Language:DE
[2000/21]
Type: B2 New European patent specification 
No.:EP0865137
Date:29.11.2006
Language:DE
[2006/48]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP21.07.1998
ClassificationInternational:H02H7/085
[1998/38]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   SE [1999/21]
Former [1998/38]AT,  BE,  CH,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Steuerung des Schliessvorgangs von Schliessvorrichtungen mit mindestens einem elektromotorisch bewegten Teil[1998/38]
English:Method of controlling the closing procedure of closable devices with at least one part driven by an electric motor[1998/38]
French:Procédé pour controller la procédure de fermeture de dispositifs de fermeture avec au moins un membre actionné par moteur électrique[1998/38]
Examination procedure01.10.1998Examination requested  [1998/49]
02.11.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
10.03.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.10.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
10.11.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
13.11.1999Fee for grant paid
13.11.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  23.02.2001   
Leopold Kostal GmbH & Co. KG
D-58505 Lüdenscheid / DE
 [2001/16]
17.04.2001Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
10.08.2001Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
12.03.2003Date of oral proceedings
09.04.2003Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
09.04.2003Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
13.06.2006Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
23.06.2006Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition
19.09.2006Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended
12.10.2006Fee for printing new specification paid
Appeal following opposition05.06.2003Appeal received No.  T0680/03
10.07.2003Statement of grounds filed
13.06.2006Result of appeal procedure: maintenance in amended form
13.06.2006Date of oral proceedings
20.06.2006Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.03.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[X]US4641067  (IIZAWA RYUJI [JP], et al) [X] 1-3 * column 3, line 13 - column 4, line 59; figures 2-5 *;
 [A]DE4339365  (REINSHAGEN KABELWERK GMBH [DE]) [A] 1 * abstract *
ExaminationDE4316898
 DE19514257
 DE3514223
 DE3034118