Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0867360

EP0867360 - Diving apparatus and method for its production [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  26.05.2006
Database last updated on 18.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip26.05.2006No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 28.06.2006  [2006/26]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Rudolph, Stephan, Dr.-Ing.
Im Lauchhau 9
70569 Stuttgart / DE
[1998/40]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
[1998/40]
Representative(s)Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner
Patentanwälte mbB
Nymphenburger Strasse 4
80335 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1998/40]TER MEER STEINMEISTER & PARTNER GbR
Mauerkircherstrasse 45
81679 München / DE
Application number, filing date98103947.205.03.1998
[1998/40]
Priority number, dateDE199711225724.03.1997         Original published format: DE 19712257
[1998/40]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0867360
Date:30.09.1998
Language:DE
[1998/40]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0867360
Date:08.11.2000
[2000/45]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0867360
Date:20.07.2005
Language:DE
[2005/29]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP26.09.2000
ClassificationInternational:B63C11/46, A63B35/02
[2000/45]
Former International [1998/40]B63C11/46
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IT [2001/30]
Former [1998/40]AT,  BE,  CH,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Tauchgerät und Verfahren zu seiner Herstellung[1998/40]
English:Diving apparatus and method for its production[1998/40]
French:Appareil de plongée et méthode pour sa production[1998/40]
Examination procedure03.05.2001Examination requested  [2001/27]
14.01.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
19.05.2005Fee for grant paid
19.05.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)21.04.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2006/26]
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.03.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
19.03.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
28.03.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
27.03.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
17.03.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
15.03.2005Renewal fee patent year 08
Documents cited:Search[X]DE521261  (WILLY BRANDEGGER DIPL ING) [X] 1-4,38 * the whole document *;
 [X]US1324961  (GRANTHAM FREDERICK G [US]) [X] 1-4,38 * the whole document *;
 [A]DE4031336  (KNAF WILHELM [DE]) [A] 1,38 * figures 1,2; claim 1 *;
 [A]DE3739887  (BARICH FRITZ W [DE], et al) [A] 1,38 * figure 3; claims 1,2 *;
 [A]  "MIT'S ROBO-TUNA TESTS UNDERWATER PROPULSION", MACHINE DESIGN,US,PENTON,INC. CLEVELAND, (19950223), vol. 67, no. 4, ISSN 0024-9114, page 18,20, XP000503726 [A] 1,38 * the whole document *