Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0894444

EP0894444 - Sports shoe [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  02.08.2003
Database last updated on 19.09.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip11.06.2004Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AT
published on 28.07.2004  [2004/31]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
BENETTON GROUP S.p.A.
Via Villa Minelli 1
31050 Ponzano Veneto (Treviso) / IT
[2000/16]
Former [1999/05]For all designated states
Benetton Sportsystem S.p.A.
Via Montebelluna 5/7
31040 Trevignano (Treviso) / IT
Inventor(s)01 / Caeran, Francesco
Via S. Gaetano, 215
31044 Montebelluna (Prov. of Treviso) / FR
02 / Balbinot, Renzo
Via Meucci, 21
31053 Pieve Di Soligo (Prov. of Treviso) / FR
03 / Tonel, Valerio
Via Montepiana, 10
31030 Biadene (Prov. of Treviso) / FR
[1999/05]
Representative(s)Modiano, Guido , et al
Dr. Modiano & Associati SpA Via Meravigli, 16
20123 Milano / IT
[N/P]
Former [1999/05]Modiano, Guido, Dr.-Ing. , et al
Modiano & Associati SpA Via Meravigli, 16
20123 Milano / IT
Application number, filing date98104125.409.03.1998
[1999/05]
Priority number, dateIT1997TV0010631.07.1997         Original published format: IT TV970106
[1999/05]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0894444
Date:03.02.1999
Language:EN
[1999/05]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0894444
Date:31.03.1999
[1999/13]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0894444
Date:25.09.2002
Language:EN
[2002/39]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP12.02.1999
ClassificationInternational:A43B5/04, A43B5/16
[1999/05]
Designated contracting statesAT,   CH,   DE,   FR,   IT,   LI [1999/50]
Former [1999/05]AT,  BE,  CH,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
Extension statesSI26.08.1999
TitleGerman:Sportschuh[1999/05]
English:Sports shoe[1999/05]
French:Chaussure de sport[1999/05]
Examination procedure26.08.1999Examination requested  [1999/43]
01.10.1999Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
17.01.2000Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) BE, DK, ES, FI, GB, GR, IE, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE
07.03.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
24.08.2000Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.10.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
30.04.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.11.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
10.04.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
10.07.2002Fee for grant paid
10.07.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)26.06.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/38]
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.02.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
23.02.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
22.02.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
03.11.1999BE   M01   Not yet paid
03.11.1999DK   M01   Not yet paid
03.11.1999ES   M01   Not yet paid
03.11.1999FI   M01   Not yet paid
03.11.1999GB   M01   Not yet paid
03.11.1999GR   M01   Not yet paid
03.11.1999IE   M01   Not yet paid
03.11.1999LU   M01   Not yet paid
03.11.1999MC   M01   Not yet paid
03.11.1999NL   M01   Not yet paid
03.11.1999PT   M01   Not yet paid
03.11.1999SE   M01   Not yet paid
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCH25.09.2002
LI25.09.2002
AT09.03.2003
[2004/31]
Former [2003/39]CH25.09.2002
LI25.09.2002
Documents cited:Search[XA]WO9603186  (CRUSH SNOWBOARD PROD INC [US]) [X] 1-4,7-11 * page 10, paragraph 3 * * page 11, paragraph 3 - paragraph 4 * * figures 20,21,25 * [A] 5,6;
 [X]DE19527320  (LEDERER STEFAN [DE]) [X] 1,2,8,10-12 * column 4, line 49 - line 62 * * column 5, line 15 - line 20 * * column 5, line 60 - column 6, line 2 * * figures 1-3 *;
 [XA]WO9421149  (SALOMON SA [FR]) [X] 1-4,7,8,10 * page 4, paragraph 5 * * claims 1,3 * * figures 1-4 * [A] 5,6,11,12;
 [PXA]WO9732496  (SALOMON SA [FR], et al) [PX] 1-4,7,8,10 * page 3, paragraph 4 - page 4, paragraph 2 * * page 5, paragraph 3 * * figures 1,2,8,9 * [PA] 11,12
by applicantFR1395865
 US3747235
 AT337047B
 FR741671
 IT1051302
 EP0484845
 EP0582551