Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0864805

EP0864805 - Housing, in particular for vehicle headlights [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  27.08.2005
Database last updated on 19.07.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip27.08.2005No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 12.10.2005  [2005/41]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Hella KGaA Hueck & Co.
Rixbecker Strasse 75
59552 Lippstadt / DE
[2004/48]
Former [1998/38]For all designated states
Hella KG Hueck & Co.
Rixbecker Strasse 75
59552 Lippstadt / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Kalwa, Matthias, Dr.
Hermannstrasse 14
59555 Lippstadt / DE
02 / Wystrach, Dieter
Schultenstrasse 19
59558 Lippstadt / DE
[1998/38]
Application number, filing date98104438.112.03.1998
[1998/38]
Priority number, dateDE199711082215.03.1997         Original published format: DE 19710822
[1998/38]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0864805
Date:16.09.1998
Language:DE
[1998/38]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0864805
Date:05.07.2000
[2000/27]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0864805
Date:20.10.2004
Language:DE
[2004/43]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP18.05.2000
ClassificationInternational:F21V31/03, H05K5/02, F21W101/10
[2004/42]
Former International [2000/27]F21M7/00, H05K5/02
Former International [1998/38]F21M7/00
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   IT [2004/29]
Former [2001/11]DE,  ES,  FR,  GB,  IT 
Former [1998/38]AT,  BE,  CH,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Gehäuse, insbesondere eines Fahrzeugscheinwerfers[1998/38]
English:Housing, in particular for vehicle headlights[1998/38]
French:Boîtier, notamment pour projecteurs de véhicule[1998/38]
Examination procedure26.10.2000Examination requested  [2000/52]
05.11.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
26.11.2003Request for decision received: Application is deemed to be withdrawn
04.12.2003Result of request for decision (Application is deemed to be withdrawn): Request granted
05.12.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
21.02.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.03.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
26.05.2004Fee for grant paid
26.05.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)21.07.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/41]
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.03.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
22.03.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
22.03.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
21.03.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
15.03.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0317896  (HELLA KG HUECK & CO [DE]) [A] 1,9 * page 3, line 55 - page 4, line 43 * * figures 1-4 *;
 [A]FR2589996  (SERVA SOC [FR]) [A] 1,9 * page 4, line 35 - page 6, line 10 * * figures 1-3 *;
 [A]EP0587502  (VALEO VISION [FR]) [A] 1 * column 1, line 16 - line 51 * * column 2, line 55 - column 6, line 49; figures 1-10 *
 [X]  - OSTREM F E, "COMBINED AIR VENT AND WATER SEAL VALVE FOR AUTOMOTIVE ELECTRONIC MODULES", MOTOROLA TECHNICAL DEVELOPMENTS, (19900301), vol. 10, page 117, XP000114679 [X] 1 * the whole document *
by applicantDE3328788
 DE3004413