Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0870648

EP0870648 - Data bus system for motor vehicles [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  10.07.2004
Database last updated on 19.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip10.07.2004No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 25.08.2004  [2004/35]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Bayerische Motoren Werke Aktiengesellschaft
Petuelring 130
80809 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1998/42]For all designated states
Bayerische Motoren Werke Aktiengesellschaft
80788 München / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Neudecker, Norbert
Strass 1
84169 Altfraunhofen / DE
[1998/42]
Application number, filing date98104485.212.03.1998
[1998/42]
Priority number, dateDE199711493710.04.1997         Original published format: DE 19714937
[1998/42]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0870648
Date:14.10.1998
Language:DE
[1998/42]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0870648
Date:19.04.2000
[2000/16]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0870648
Date:03.09.2003
Language:DE
[2003/36]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP07.03.2000
ClassificationInternational:B60R16/02, B60R16/04
[2000/14]
Former International [1998/42]B60R16/02
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   SE [2000/52]
Former [1998/42]AT,  BE,  CH,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Datenbussystem für Kraftfahrzeuge[1998/42]
English:Data bus system for motor vehicles[1998/42]
French:Système de bus de données pour des véhicules automobiles[1998/42]
Examination procedure17.10.2000Examination requested  [2000/50]
01.07.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
30.10.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.03.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
24.06.2003Fee for grant paid
24.06.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)04.06.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/35]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.03.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
23.03.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
23.03.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
22.03.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[X]US5554978  (SAKAGAMI ATSUSHI [JP], et al) [X] 1,2 * column 2, line 50 - column 3, line 17 * * column 5, line 30 - line 60 *;
 [A]EP0443465  (EATON CORP [US]) [A] 1 * column 9, line 46 - line 55 *;
 [A]DE19515194  (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]) [A] 1 * column 7, line 8 - line 24 *