Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0982048

EP0982048 - Implant for controlled drainage of cerebrospinal fluid [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  28.07.2000
Database last updated on 15.08.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip28.07.2000Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 13.09.2000 [2000/37]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Leonhardt, Steffen, Dr.-Ing.
Arnimstrasse 10b
23566 Lübeck / DE
For all designated states
Isermann, Rolf, Prof.-Dr.-Ing. Dr.h.c.
Am Hernertsberg 2A
64342 Seeheim / DE
For all designated states
Walter, Marian, Dipl.-Ing.
Gervinusstrasse 46
64287 Darmstadt / DE
For all designated states
Steudel, Wolf Ingo, Prof. Dr. med.
Mispelweg 31
66424 Homburg/Saar / DE
[2000/09]
Inventor(s)01 / Leonhardt, Steffen, Dipl.-Ing.
Arminstrasse 10 B
23566 Lübeck / DE
02 / Walter, Marian, Dipl.-Ing.
Gervinusstrasse 46
64287 Darmstadt / DE
03 / Isermann, Rolf, Prof. Dr.-Ing. Dr.h.c.
Am Hernertsberg 2A
64342 Seeheim / DE
04 / Steudel, Wolf Ingo, Prof. Dr.med.
Mispelweg 31
66424 Homburg/Saar / DE
[2000/09]
Representative(s)von Fischern, Bernhard , et al
Hoffmann - Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Arabellastrasse 4
81925 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/09]von Fischern, Bernhard, Dipl.-Ing. , et al
Hoffmann - Eitle, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Arabellastrasse 4
81925 München / DE
Application number, filing date98104492.812.03.1998
[2000/09]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0982048
Date:01.03.2000
Language:DE
[2000/09]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP26.08.1998
ClassificationInternational:A61M27/00
[2000/09]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/09]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:Implantat zur kontrollierten Ableitung von Gehirnflüssigkeit[2000/09]
English:Implant for controlled drainage of cerebrospinal fluid[2000/09]
French:Implant de drainage à commande de fluide cephalo-rachidien[2000/09]
Examination procedure20.07.2000Application withdrawn by applicant  [2000/37]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.03.200003   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]DE3633080  (MUELLER WICKOP JUERGEN DR [DE]) [X] 1-5,9,10 * the whole document *;
 [XA]DE19645725  (SICAN F & E GMBH SIBET [DE]) [X] 1,2 * page 1, column 2, line 62 - page 2, column 3, line 51; figure 1 * [A] 7;
 [A]US5704352  (TREMBLAY GERALD F [US], et al) [A] 1-5,9,10 * column 7, line 16 - column 8, line 16; figures 1-4 *;
 [A]DE3127882  (MORINGLANE JEAN RICHARD DR) [A] 1,2,6-8 * abstract *
 [X]  KO W H ET AL, "CEREBROSPINAL FLUID CONTROL SYSTEM", PROCEEDINGS OF THE IEEE, (19880901), vol. 76, no. 9, pages 1226 - 1235, XP000094517 [X] 1-3,5 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/5.9669