Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0866069

EP0866069 - Preparation of ascorbyl monophosphates [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  10.10.2003
Database last updated on 16.06.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip10.10.2003No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 26.11.2003  [2003/48]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
F. Hoffmann-La Roche AG
4070 Basel / CH
[N/P]
Former [1998/39]For all designated states
F. HOFFMANN-LA ROCHE AG
4070 Basel / CH
Inventor(s)01 / Dlubala, Alain
6, Rue du Temple
68170 Rixheim / FR
02 / Nösberger, Paul
1 Passwangstrasse
4127 Birsfelden / CH
[1998/39]
Application number, filing date98104657.614.03.1998
[1998/39]
Priority number, dateEP1997010455418.03.1997         Original published format: EP 97104554
[1998/39]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0866069
Date:23.09.1998
Language:DE
[1998/39]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0866069
Date:23.02.2000
[2000/08]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0866069
Date:04.12.2002
Language:DE
[2002/49]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP21.01.2000
ClassificationInternational:C07F9/655
[1998/39]
Designated contracting statesCH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   NL,   SE [2000/44]
Former [1998/39]AT,  BE,  CH,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Herstellung von Ascorbylmonophosphaten[1998/39]
English:Preparation of ascorbyl monophosphates[1998/39]
French:Préparation de monophosphates d'ascorbyle[1998/39]
Examination procedure12.08.2000Examination requested  [2000/41]
06.03.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
02.07.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
11.09.2002Fee for grant paid
11.09.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)05.09.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/48]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.03.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
16.03.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
13.03.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0508233  (HOFFMANN LA ROCHE [CH]) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *;
 [DA]US5110950  (SEIB PAUL A [US], et al) [DA] 1-10 * the whole document *;
 [A]  LIAO MING-LONG, "A stable form of vitamin C : L-ascorbate 2-triphosphate.", JOURNAL OF AGRICULTURAL AND FOOD CHEMISTRY., AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY. WASHINGTON., US, (1990), vol. 38, no. 2, pages 355 - 366, XP002126717 [A] 1-10 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jf00092a004