Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0884014

EP0884014 - Support for wristwatches,jewellery chains or bracelets [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  19.09.2003
Database last updated on 16.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip15.02.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 19.03.2008  [2008/12]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
E. Wilhelm GmbH Etuifabrik
Lahrer Strasse 4-6
77933 Lahr / DE
[1998/51]
Inventor(s)01 / Tobler, Ernst
Pinelands 7405
23 Union Avenue / ZA
[1998/51]
Representative(s)Baumann, Eduard K.
Boehmert & Boehmert, Anwaltssozietät, Postfach 1201
85632 Höhenkirchen / DE
[N/P]
Former [1998/51]Baumann, Eduard
Boehmert & Boehmert, Anwaltssozietät, Postfach 1201
85632 Höhenkirchen / DE
Application number, filing date98104852.318.03.1998
[1998/51]
Priority number, dateDE1997208984U22.05.1997         Original published format: DE 29708984 U
[1998/51]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0884014
Date:16.12.1998
Language:DE
[1998/51]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0884014
Date:03.01.2001
[2001/01]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0884014
Date:13.11.2002
Language:DE
[2002/46]
Type: B9 Corrected patent specification 
No.:EP0884014
Date:06.10.2004
[2004/41]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP17.11.2000
ClassificationInternational:A47F7/02
[1998/51]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL [2001/38]
Former [1998/51]AT,  BE,  CH,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Halter für Armbanduhren, Schmuckketten und Schmuckbänder[1998/51]
English:Support for wristwatches,jewellery chains or bracelets[1998/51]
French:Support pour montres bracelet,chaînes de bijouterie et bracelets[1998/51]
Examination procedure08.02.2001Examination requested  [2001/14]
28.05.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
10.06.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
30.07.2002Fee for grant paid
30.07.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)14.08.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/45]
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.03.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
27.03.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
21.03.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipIT13.11.2002
LU18.03.2003
BE31.03.2003
ES29.05.2003
[2008/12]
Former [2004/39]LU18.03.2003
BE31.03.2003
ES29.05.2003
Former [2004/28]BE31.03.2003
ES29.05.2003
Former [2004/04]ES29.05.2003
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0063667  (STOBA AG [CH]) [A] 1 * page 4, line 7 - page 5, line 25; figures 1,2 *;
 [A]FR1024308  (CIROT) [A] 1 * the whole document *;
 [A]US5579906  (FABBRI TERENCE [US], et al) [A] 1 * column A; figure 1 *