EP0871145 - Mailing machine including dimensional rating capability [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.04.2005 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.02.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 19.03.2008 [2008/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pitney Bowes Inc. World Headquarters One Elmcroft Road Stamford, CT 06926-0700 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2004/24] | For all designated states PITNEY BOWES INC. World Headquarters, One Elmcroft Road Stamford, Connecticut 06926-0700 / US | ||
Former [1998/42] | For all designated states PITNEY BOWES INC. World Headquarters, One Elmcroft Road Stamford Connecticut 06926-0700 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Freeman, Gerald C. 185 West Norwalk Road Norwalk, CT 06850 / US | 02 /
Salazar, Edilberto I. 13 Hidden Brook Drive Brookfield, CT 06804 / US | 03 /
Schoonmaker, Richard P. 209 Catalpa Road Wilton, CT 06897 / US | 04 /
Schulz, Kenneth A. 5 Hoyt Road Bethel, CT 06801 / US | [1998/42] | Representative(s) | Avery, Stephen John, et al Hoffmann Eitle ATTENTION : ADDRESS INACTIVE - USE ASS-NR - CDR / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/42] | Avery, Stephen John, et al Hoffmann Eitle, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 98104898.6 | 18.03.1998 | [1998/42] | Priority number, date | US19970826325 | 27.03.1997 Original published format: US 826325 | [1998/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0871145 | Date: | 14.10.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/42] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0871145 | Date: | 07.06.2000 | [2000/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0871145 | Date: | 09.06.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.04.2000 | Classification | IPC: | G07B17/00 | [1998/42] | CPC: |
G07B17/00661 (EP,US);
G07B17/00362 (EP,US);
G07B2017/0037 (EP,US);
G07B2017/00669 (EP,US);
G07B2017/00685 (EP,US);
G07B2017/00693 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [2004/09] |
Former [2001/07] | DE, FR, GB | ||
Former [1998/42] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Postmaschine mit abmessungsabhängiger Gebührenerfassungsfähigkeit | [1998/42] | English: | Mailing machine including dimensional rating capability | [1998/42] | French: | Machine postale ayant la capacité de déterminer la tarification en fonction des dimensions | [1998/42] | Examination procedure | 30.11.2000 | Examination requested [2001/04] | 24.04.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.10.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.12.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.03.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 26.03.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.03.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CH | 09.06.2004 | IT | 09.06.2004 | LI | 09.06.2004 | [2008/12] |
Former [2004/51] | CH | 09.06.2004 | |
LI | 09.06.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]GB2236859 (ALCATEL BUSINESS SYSTEMS [GB]) [X] 1-7,10-15 * page 1, line 2 - line 27 * * page 6, line 8 - page 7, line 7 * * page 11, line 22 - page 12, line 12 * * figure 7; claims 4,11,17,18 * [A] 8,9,16,17; | [A]EP0548464 (ALCATEL ITALIA [IT]) [A] 1,8-10,16,17 * page 2, line 4 - line 21 ** abstract *; | [XA]US5535127 (UNO TERUHIKO [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,10,11 * column 6, line 5 - line 29 * * column 6, line 58 - column 7, line 25 * * column 14, line 51 - line 64 * * column 15; table 1 * * figures 2,3,6; claims 1-3 * [A] 3-9,12-17 | by applicant | US4797814 | US5154246 | EP0831428 |