Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0881136

EP0881136 - Method to form the safe confidence range of a position fixing solution [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  14.11.2003
Database last updated on 19.09.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip14.11.2003No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 02.01.2004  [2004/01]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1
DE-80333 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1998/49]For all designated states
SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
Wittelsbacherplatz 2
80333 München / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Klinge, Karl-A.
Wendemaschstrasse 2
38114 Braunschweig / DE
[1998/49]
Application number, filing date98105117.020.03.1998
[1998/49]
Priority number, dateDE199712289929.05.1997         Original published format: DE 19722899
[1998/49]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0881136
Date:02.12.1998
Language:DE
[1998/49]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0881136
Date:27.09.2000
[2000/39]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0881136
Date:02.01.2003
Language:DE
[2003/01]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP17.08.2000
ClassificationInternational:B61L25/02, G01C21/20
[2000/40]
Former International [1998/49]B61L25/02
Designated contracting statesAT,   CH,   DE,   ES,   FR,   IT,   LI [2001/24]
Former [1998/49]AT,  BE,  CH,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Verfahren zum Bilden des sicherheitsrelevanten Vertrauensintervalls einer Ortungslösung[1998/49]
English:Method to form the safe confidence range of a position fixing solution[1998/49]
French:Procédé pour former un intervalle de confiance de sécurité d'une solution de localisation[1998/49]
Examination procedure04.09.2000Examination requested  [2000/44]
26.06.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
19.07.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
07.10.2002Fee for grant paid
07.10.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)03.10.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2004/01]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.03.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
19.03.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
18.03.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0537499  (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-13 * the whole document *;
 [A]US5155688  (TANAKA ICHIRO [JP], et al) [A] 1-13 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP0522862  (PIONEER ELECTRONIC CORP [JP]) [A] 1-13 * the whole document *