Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0868917

EP0868917 - Use of stevia extracts for the manufacture of an antihistaminic composition [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  11.10.2002
Database last updated on 17.07.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip11.10.2002No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 27.11.2002  [2002/48]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Sato, Naohiko
32-14 Chofugaoka 2-chome, Chofu-shi
Tokyo / JP
[2001/48]
Former [1998/41]For all designated states
Sato, Naohiko
2-32-14, Chofugaoka
Chofu-shi, Tokyo-to / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Sato, Minoru
31-9, Hiyoshidai 1-Chome, Tomiyamachi
Kurokawa-gun, Miyagi-ken / JP
02 / Takeuchi, Masaaki
18-1-305, Nakayama 4-Chome, Aoba-ku
Sendai-shi, Miyagi-ken / JP
03 / Sato, Naohiko
32-14, Chofugaoka 2-Chome
Chofu-shi, Tokyo / JP
[1998/41]
Representative(s)Prüfer, Lutz H. , et al
PRÜFER & PARTNER GbR
Patentanwälte
Harthauser Strasse 25d
81545 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1998/41]Prüfer, Lutz H., Dipl.-Phys. , et al
PRÜFER & PARTNER GbR, Patentanwälte, Harthauser Strasse 25d
81545 München / DE
Application number, filing date98105410.925.03.1998
[1998/41]
Priority number, dateJP1997009439731.03.1997         Original published format: JP 9439797
[1998/41]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0868917
Date:07.10.1998
Language:EN
[1998/41]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0868917
Date:05.12.2001
Language:EN
[2001/49]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP18.05.1998
ClassificationInternational:A61K35/78, A61P37/08, A61P1/02
[2001/31]
Former International [1998/41]A61K35/78
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [1999/24]
Former [1998/41]AT,  BE,  CH,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Verwendung von Steviaextrakten zur Herstellung einer antihistaminischen Zusammensetzung[2001/30]
English:Use of stevia extracts for the manufacture of an antihistaminic composition[1998/41]
French:Utilisation d'extraits de stévia pour la fabrication d'une composition antihistaminique[1998/41]
Former [1998/41]Verwendung von Steviaextrakten zur Herstellung einer antihistaminischen Zusammentsetzung
Examination procedure25.03.1998Request for accelerated examination filed
29.03.1999Examination requested  [1999/22]
27.04.1999Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
27.04.1999Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes
18.08.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.12.1999Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
06.04.2000Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.05.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
28.07.2000Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.08.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
20.12.2000Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.02.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
11.04.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.04.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
31.05.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.06.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
21.09.2001Fee for grant paid
21.09.2001Fee for publishing/printing paid
01.10.2001Communication of intention to grant the patent
Opposition(s)06.09.2002No opposition filed within time limit [2002/48]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.03.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
29.03.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[X]EP0525740  (DOZONO FUMIO [JP], et al) [X] 1-5 * page 2, line 42 - line 49; claim 1 * * page 4 - page 5 *;
 [X]US5262161  (DOZONO FUMIO [JP]) [X] 1-4 * column 2, line 34 - column 3, line 28 *;
 [X]CN1137381  ;
 [X]CN1080864  ;
 [X]JPH0952827  ;
 [X]JPH08325156
 [X]  - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 98, no. 05, Database accession no. 98-042992, XP002064307 & CN1137381 A 00000000 (BEIJING ULTRAMICROBIOLOGICAL PROD CO LTD) [X] 1,5,6 * abstract *
 [X]  - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 97, no. 12, Database accession no. 97-119937, XP002064308 & CN1080864 A 00000000 (SHENYANG COLLEGE PHARMACY) [X] 1,5,6 * abstract *
 [X]  - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 97, no. 18, Database accession no. 97-197202, XP002064309 & JPH0952827 A 00000000 (TAISHO PHARM CO LTD) [X] 1,5,6 * abstract *
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19970430), vol. 097, no. 004, & JP08325156 A 19961210 (ICHIMARU PHARCOS CO LTD) [X] 1-6 * abstract *