Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0947486

EP0947486 - Process for producing coloured articles, particularly orange/red coloured articles, based on zirconia and coloured decorative article produced thereby [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  09.04.2004
Database last updated on 09.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip09.04.2004No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 26.05.2004  [2004/22]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ASULAB S.A.
Rue des Sors 3
2074 Marin / CH
[2003/21]
Former [1999/40]For all designated states
ASULAB S.A.
Faubourg du Lac 6
CH-2501 Bienne / CH
Inventor(s)01 / Michel, Béatrice
Pré-de-Riaux
1588 Montet sur Cudrefin / CH
02 / Lemaire, Lionel
Marterey 36
1005 Lausanne / CH
[1999/40]
Representative(s)Ravenel, Thierry Gérard Louis , et al
ICB
Ingénieurs Conseils en Brevets SA
Faubourg de l'Hôpital 3
2001 Neuchâtel / CH
[N/P]
Former [1999/40]Ravenel, Thierry Gérard Louis , et al
I C B, Ingénieurs Conseils en Brevets SA, 7, rue des Sors
2074 Marin / CH
Application number, filing date98105472.926.03.1998
[1999/40]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0947486
Date:06.10.1999
Language:FR
[1999/40]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0947486
Date:04.06.2003
Language:FR
[2003/23]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP20.08.1998
ClassificationInternational:C04B35/486, G04B37/22
[1999/40]
Designated contracting statesCH,   DE,   FR,   LI [2000/24]
Former [1999/40]AT,  BE,  CH,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Herstellung eines farbigen, insbesondere orangeroten, Gegenstandes auf Zirkonoxidbasis sowie nach diesem Verfahren hergestellter farbiger dekorativer Gegenstand[1999/40]
English:Process for producing coloured articles, particularly orange/red coloured articles, based on zirconia and coloured decorative article produced thereby[1999/40]
French:Procédé de fabrication d'un article coloré, en particulier de couleur orange/rouge, à base de zircone et article décoratif coloré à base de zircone obtenu selon ce procédé[1999/40]
Examination procedure06.04.2000Examination requested  [2000/23]
25.05.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
20.10.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.04.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
01.08.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.08.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
29.08.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.11.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
25.03.2003Fee for grant paid
25.03.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)05.03.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/22]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.03.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
02.04.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
02.04.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
31.03.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0218853  (TORAY INDUSTRIES [JP]) [A] 1,4,5,7,8 * claims 1,16,17,26 *;
 [A]EP0700796  (BASF AG [DE]) [A] 1,4-8 * example -; claims 1,6-8 *