EP0870933 - Method and device for manufacturing a connection between two elements [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.09.2003 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.07.2009 | Change - representative | published on 02.09.2009 [2009/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HENNIGES ELASTOMER- UND KUNSTSTOFFTECHNIK GMBH & CO KG Nienburger Strasse 46 D-31547 Rehburg-Loccum / DE | [1998/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kreye, Bernhard Uhlenkamp 41 31515 Wunstorf / DE | [1998/42] | Representative(s) | Jabbusch, Wolfgang, et al Jabbusch Siekmann & Wasiljeff Hauptstrasse 85 26131 Oldenburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/36] | Jabbusch, Wolfgang, et al Jabbusch Arendt & Siekmann Koppelstrasse 3 26135 Oldenburg / DE | ||
Former [1998/42] | Jabbusch, Wolfgang, Dipl, -Ing., Dr., et al Patentanwälte Dipl.-Ing. Dr. W. Jabbusch, Dipl.-Ing. W. Wehser, Dipl.-Ing. M. Jabbusch, Dipl.-Phys. G. Siekmann, Koppelstrasse 3 26135 Oldenburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 98105516.3 | 26.03.1998 | [1998/42] | Priority number, date | DE1997114242 | 07.04.1997 Original published format: DE 19714242 | [1998/42] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0870933 | Date: | 14.10.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/42] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0870933 | Date: | 11.11.1998 | [1998/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0870933 | Date: | 20.11.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.09.1998 | Classification | IPC: | F16B1/00 | [1998/42] | CPC: |
B29C66/474 (EP);
B29C65/54 (EP);
B29C65/58 (EP);
B29C66/112 (EP);
B29C66/114 (EP);
B29C66/43 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1999/29] |
Former [1998/42] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Herstellen einer Verbindung zwischen zwei Bauteilen | [1998/42] | English: | Method and device for manufacturing a connection between two elements | [1998/42] | French: | Dispositif et procédé pour réaliser une connection entre deux éléments | [1998/42] | Examination procedure | 07.01.1999 | Examination requested [1999/10] | 26.11.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.03.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.05.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 18.06.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.07.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 23.07.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.08.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.02.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4250596 (HARA KUNIO, et al) [X] 1 * column 3, line 4 - line 36; figure 2 *; | [X]FR2542829 (ITW DE FRANCE [FR]) [X] 1 * page 2, line 29 - page 5, line 23; figures 1-16 *; | [X]FR2189488 (LE GUEN FRANCOI [FR]) [X] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]FR2540212 (LAQUES INDOCHINOISES CAOUTCHOU [FR]) [A] 1,5,6,8,9 * page 4, line 11 - page 5, line 3; figures 1-4 *; | [A]FR2633233 (CIBIE PROJECTEURS [FR]) [A] 1 * figures 1,2; claim 1 * |