Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0855138

EP0855138 - Insecticidal composition [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  18.10.2002
Database last updated on 22.06.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip25.07.2008Change - representativepublished on 27.08.2008  [2008/35]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SUMITOMO CHEMICAL COMPANY, LIMITED
5-33, Kitahama 4-chome Chuo-ku
Osaka 305 / JP
[N/P]
Former [1998/31]For all designated states
SUMITOMO CHEMICAL COMPANY, LIMITED
5-33, Kitahama 4-chome
Chuo-ku, Osaka 305 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Tanaka, Yasunori
9-17, Sakuragaoka-4-chome
Minoo-shi / JP
02 / Matsunaga, Tadahiro
1-1, Hinomine-4-chome
Kita-ku, Kobe-shi / JP
[1998/39]
Representative(s)Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/35]Vossius & Partner
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
Former [1998/31]VOSSIUS & PARTNER
Siebertstrasse 4
81675 München / DE
Application number, filing date98105857.116.07.1993
[1998/31]
Priority number, dateJP1992019067617.07.1992         Original published format: JP 19067692
JP1992019067717.07.1992         Original published format: JP 19067792
[1998/31]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0855138
Date:29.07.1998
Language:EN
[1998/31]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0855138
Date:12.12.2001
Language:EN
[2001/50]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.05.1998
ClassificationInternational:A01N53/00, // (A01N53/00, 37:02, 25:22, 25:18)
[1998/31]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT [1998/31]
TitleGerman:Insektizide Zusammensetzung[1998/31]
English:Insecticidal composition[1998/31]
French:Compositon insecticide[1998/31]
Examination procedure29.12.1998Examination requested  [1999/09]
30.01.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No)
11.06.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval)
25.06.2001Communication of intention to grant the patent
05.10.2001Fee for grant paid
05.10.2001Fee for publishing/printing paid
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP93111444.1  / EP0579245
Opposition(s)13.09.2002No opposition filed within time limit [2002/49]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.03.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
31.03.1998Renewal fee patent year 04
31.03.1998Renewal fee patent year 05
31.03.1998Renewal fee patent year 06
28.07.1999Renewal fee patent year 07
31.07.2000Renewal fee patent year 08
31.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 09
Lapses during opposition  TooltipGB16.07.2002
[2004/21]
Documents cited:Search[AD]US4889872  (NAUMANN KLAUS [DE], et al);
 [A]GB2002635  (FUMAKILLA LTD);
 [A]DE2738878  (BERNABE GIUSEPPINA)