Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0872942

EP0872942 - System for stabilising a power supply network [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  30.09.2005
Database last updated on 26.06.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip15.06.2007Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MC
published on 18.07.2007  [2007/29]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
RWE Piller GmbH
Abgunst 24
37520 Osterode am Harz / DE
[2002/39]
Former [1998/43]For all designated states
PILLER-GmbH
Abgunst 24
37520 Osterode am Harz / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Briest, Ralf, Dr.
Faule Breite 60
37520 Osterode / DE
02 / Darrelmann, Hilmar
Am hohen Ofen 9
37520 Osterode / DE
03 / Sachs, Klaus
Quellenweg 26
37520 Osterode / DE
04 / Schrader-Hausmann, Uwe
Hüttenfledstrasse 5
37520 Osterode / DE
[1998/43]
Representative(s)Hoeger, Stellrecht & Partner Patentanwälte mbB
Uhlandstrasse 14c
70182 Stuttgart / DE
[N/P]
Former [1998/43]Hoeger, Stellrecht & Partner
Uhlandstrasse 14 c
70182 Stuttgart / DE
Application number, filing date98106024.702.04.1998
[1998/43]
Priority number, dateDE199711546814.04.1997         Original published format: DE 19715468
[1998/43]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0872942
Date:21.10.1998
Language:DE
[1998/43]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0872942
Date:19.01.2000
[2000/03]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0872942
Date:24.11.2004
Language:DE
[2004/48]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP07.12.1999
ClassificationInternational:H02J3/30
[2000/03]
Former International [1998/43]H02J3/24
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [1998/43]
TitleGerman:System zur Stabilisierung eines Stromversorgungsnetzes[1998/43]
English:System for stabilising a power supply network[1998/43]
French:Système pour la stabilization d'un réseau d'alimentation en puissance[1998/43]
Examination procedure30.06.2000Examination requested  [2000/35]
23.10.2000Observations by third parties
12.10.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
22.04.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
31.10.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
25.02.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.05.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
24.09.2004Fee for grant paid
24.09.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP02014398.8  / EP1271741
Opposition(s)25.08.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/46]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.04.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
26.04.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
25.04.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
25.04.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
24.04.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFI24.11.2004
DK24.02.2005
GR24.02.2005
CY02.04.2005
LU02.04.2005
MC30.04.2005
[2007/29]
Former [2007/26]FI24.11.2004
DK24.02.2005
GR24.02.2005
CY02.04.2005
LU02.04.2005
Former [2007/21]FI24.11.2004
DK24.02.2005
GR24.02.2005
CY02.04.2005
LU30.04.2005
Former [2007/17]FI24.11.2004
DK24.02.2005
GR24.02.2005
LU30.04.2005
Former [2005/46]FI24.11.2004
DK24.02.2005
GR24.02.2005
Former [2005/26]FI24.11.2004
GR24.02.2005
Former [2005/24]FI24.11.2004
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0220713  (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]) [A] 1-26 * abstract * * column 5, line 28 - line 42 * * figure 3 *;
 [A]DE3931800  (ISET INST FUER SOLARE ENERGIEV [DE]) [A] 1-26 * abstract * * column 3, line 15 - line 49 * * figure 3 *;
 [A]DE2853207  (SIEMENS AG) [A] 1-26 * abstract * * page 3, line 4 - line 16 * * page 4, line 11 - line 31 *
otherDE2041924
 AT176919B
 EP0071852
 WO9718621
 US4694235
 US4700094
 DE19608099
 WO9624981
 EP0069567
 GB2007036
 WO9605646
    TAKAHASHI I AND MISHIMA G., "Development of a Simple Flywheel UPS having active Filter ability", EUROPEAN POWER ELECTRONICS CONFERENCE, FIRENZE, IT, (19910902), pages 1-282 - 1-287, XP002933828
    BOUWKNEGT K., "The Line-Interactive Concept, an Optimal Approach to UPS", PROCEEDINGS TELESCON 94 - TELESCON 94 CONFERENCE, BERLIN, DE, (19940411), pages 357 - 359, XP002933829
    OFFRINGA L.J.J., ELECTRONIC POWER CONVERTER FOR A FLYWHEEL UNIT WITH A SYNCHRONOUS ELECTRICAL PERMANENT MAGNET MACHINE, HELMOND, NL, BOEK EN OFFSETDRUKKERIJ LETRU, pages 1 - 15, ISBN 90-900464-1, XP002933830