blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0871020 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0871020



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 98
07.09.2010 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant Search / examination 1
11.09.2003 Closing of application Search / examination 1
04.06.2003 Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee Search / examination 1
28.05.2003 Application deemed to be withdrawn (translations of claims/payment missing) Search / examination 1
04.12.2002 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
04.12.2002 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 4
04.12.2002 Text intended for grant Search / examination 14
07.02.2001 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
07.02.2001 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 1
31.01.2001 Request for transfer of rights Search / examination 5
18.01.2000 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
30.11.1999 Annex to European Search report Search / examination 1
30.11.1999 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
30.11.1999 European search report Search / examination 1
08.05.1998 Letter concerning the priority Search / examination 1
08.05.1998 Priority document Search / examination 12
08.04.1998 Abstract Search / examination 1
08.04.1998 Claims Search / examination 3
08.04.1998 Description Search / examination 9
08.04.1998 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
08.04.1998 Drawings Search / examination 2
08.04.1998 Drawings Search / examination 1
08.04.1998 General authorisation Search / examination 1
08.04.1998 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
08.04.1998 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 6
06.04.1998 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
06.04.1998 General authorisation Search / examination 1
06.04.1998 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 6
06.04.1998 Specification filed by fax and/or in non-official language Search / examination 16