blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP0871020


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
12.09.2003 Application deemed to be withdrawn published on  29.10.2003  [2003/44]
03.06.2003 Surcharge for renewal fee
22.05.2003 Application deemed to be withdrawn
30.11.2002 Communication of intention to grant a patent
17.04.2002 Renewal fee
02.04.2001 Renewal fee
02.02.2001 Change - applicant published on  21.03.2001 [2001/12]
02.02.2001 Change - representative published on  21.03.2001 [2001/12]
02.10.2000 Change - extension states
04.08.2000 Definitive list of designations published on  20.09.2000 [2000/38]
31.03.2000 Request for examination filed published on  17.05.2000 [2000/20]
22.03.2000 Renewal fee
26.11.1999 Publication of search report published on  12.01.2000 [2000/02]
28.08.1998 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  14.10.1998 [1998/42]