blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP0871020
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
EP0871020Global Dossier 12.01.2000A3
EP0871020 14.10.1998A2
Priority number Date
DE29706183 08.04.1997
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
DE29706183U 06.08.1998U1
Priority number Date
DE29706183 08.04.1997
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
IL123997 14.06.2001A
Priority number Date
DE29706183 08.04.1997
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
US6011223 04.01.2000A
Priority number Date
DE29706183 08.04.1997