Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0871020

EP0871020 - Container with flexible inner part [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  12.09.2003
Database last updated on 19.06.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip12.09.2003Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 29.10.2003  [2003/44]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
mht material handling technologies GmbH & Co. KG
Grönerstrasse 48
71636 Ludwigsburg / DE
[2001/12]
Former [1998/42]For all designated states
Mann + Hummel ProTec GmbH
Postfach 364
71603 Ludwigsburg / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Poller, Stephan
Albrechtstrasse 12
71636 Ludwigsburg / DE
02 / Weigel, Viktor
Ahornweg 16
71679 Asperg / DE
[1998/42]
Representative(s)Riedel, Peter , et al
Patent- und Rechtsanwalts-Kanzlei
Dipl.-Ing. W. Jackisch & Partner
Menzelstrasse 40
70192 Stuttgart / DE
[N/P]
Former [2001/12]Riedel, Peter, Dipl.-Ing. , et al
Patentanwalt, Dipl.-Ing. W. Jackisch & Partner, Menzelstrasse 40
70192 Stuttgart / DE
Former [1998/42]Voth, Gerhard, Dipl.-Ing.
FILTERWERK MANN + HUMMEL GMBH Postfach 4 09
71631 Ludwigsburg / DE
Application number, filing date98106250.806.04.1998
[1998/42]
Priority number, dateDE1997206183U08.04.1997         Original published format: DE 29706183 U
[1998/42]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0871020
Date:14.10.1998
Language:DE
[1998/42]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0871020
Date:12.01.2000
[2000/02]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP30.11.1999
ClassificationInternational:G01G13/18, B65D90/56
[1998/42]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/38]
Former [1998/42]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Behälter mit einem flexiblen Innenteil[1998/42]
English:Container with flexible inner part[1998/42]
French:Conteneur avec une partie centrale flexible[1998/42]
Examination procedure21.03.2000Examination requested  [2000/20]
04.12.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
07.04.2003Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2003/44]
28.05.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [2003/44]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.03.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
23.03.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
25.03.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.04.200306   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[AD]EP0714016  (MANN & HUMMEL FILTER [DE]) [AD] 1 * abstract *;
 [A]US5127483  (HOUGH RICHARD M [US]) [A] 1 * column A; figures 6,7 *;
 [A]GB2134220  (BADHAM COLIN) [A] 1 * column A; figure 4 *