blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0870977

EP0870977 - Lamp reflector [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  21.03.2003
Database last updated on 19.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip12.03.2010Change - representativepublished on 14.04.2010  [2010/15]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
TRILUX-LENZE GmbH + Co. KG
Heidestrasse
59759 Arnsberg / DE
[N/P]
Former [1998/42]For all designated states
TRILUX-LENZE GmbH & Co. KG
Heidestrasse
D-59759 Arnsberg / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Grimm, Manfred
Mühlenberg 81
59759 Arnsberg / DE
[1998/42]
Representative(s)dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB
Deichmannhaus am Dom
Bahnhofsvorplatz 1
50667 Köln / DE
[N/P]
Former [2010/15]von Kreisler Selting Werner
Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1
50667 Köln / DE
Former [1998/42]Selting, Günther, Dipl.-Ing., et al
Patentanwälte von Kreisler, Selting, Werner Postfach 10 22 41
50462 Köln / DE
Application number, filing date98106308.407.04.1998
[1998/42]
Priority number, dateDE1997206447U11.04.1997         Original published format: DE 29706447 U
[1998/42]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0870977
Date:14.10.1998
Language:DE
[1998/42]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0870977
Date:09.08.2000
[2000/32]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP26.06.2000
ClassificationIPC:F21V7/00, F21V13/12, F21V3/04, F21V17/00
[1998/42]
CPC:
F21V3/04 (EP); F21V11/14 (EP); F21V13/10 (EP);
F21V7/0016 (EP); F21V7/005 (EP)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL [2001/17]
Former [1998/42]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Reflektorleuchte[1998/42]
English:Lamp reflector[1998/42]
French:Lampe à réflecteur[1998/42]
Examination procedure10.01.2001Examination requested  [2001/11]
17.03.2003Application withdrawn by applicant  [2003/19]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.04.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
28.04.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
27.04.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[DA]DE8519706U  (HARTMANN & UNGER GMBH) [DA] 1 * page 4, line 4 - line 6 * * figures 1,2 *;
 [DA]DE9213886U  (ZUMTOBEL LICHT GMBH) [DA] 1 * page 3, line 28 - page 4, line 15 * * page 4, line 16 - line 19 * * figures 1-4 *;
 [A]GB2215447  (DESIGNED ARCHITECTURAL LIGHTIN [GB]) [A] 1 * page 3, line 22 - page 4, line 5 * * figures 1,2 *;
 [A]US5004785  (IDA KOZO [JP], et al) [A] 1 * column 1, line 7 - line 10 * * column 1, line 64 - column 2, line 11 *;
 [A]DE4216341  (ROEHM GMBH [DE]) [A] 1 * page 2, line 61 - page 3, line 8 *;
 [A]US4991070  (STOB HENRY R [US]) [A] 2-5 * column 4, line 16 - line 22 * * column 4, line 32 - line 50 * * column 5, line 19 - line 22 * * figures 1,2,2A,4,5 *
by applicantDE8519706U
 DE9213886U
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.