Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0870617

EP0870617 - Ink cartridge capable of preventing leak of ink [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  21.03.2003
Database last updated on 19.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip21.03.2003Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 07.05.2003  [2003/19]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
FUJI XEROX CO., LTD.
17-22, Akasaka 2-chome Minato-ku
Tokyo / JP
[N/P]
Former [2002/28]For all designated states
FUJI XEROX CO., LTD.
17-22, Akasaka 2-chome
Minato-ku, Tokyo / JP
Former [1998/42]For all designated states
NEC CORPORATION
7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku
Tokyo / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Saeki, Tomoya
NEC Niigata Ltd., 7546, Oaza Yasuda
Kashiwazaki-shi, Niigata / JP
02 / Mizoguchi, Tadashi
NEC Niigata Ltd., 7546, Oaza Yasuda
Kashiwazaki-shi, Niigata / JP
03 / Suetsugu, Junichi
NEC Niigata Ltd., 7546, Oaza Yasuda
Kashiwazaki-shi, Niigata / JP
04 / Minemoto, Hitoshi
NEC Niigata Ltd., 7546, Oaza Yasuda
Kashiwazaki-shi, Niigata / JP
05 / Takemoto, Hitoshi
NEC Niigata Ltd., 7546, Oaza Yasuda
Kashiwazaki-shi, Niigata / JP
06 / Shima, Kazuo
NEC Niigata Ltd., 7546, Oaza Yasuda
Kashiwazaki-shi, Niigata / JP
07 / Hagiwara, Yoshihiro
NEC Niigata Ltd., 7546, Oaza Yasuda
Kashiwazaki-shi, Niigata / JP
08 / Yakushiji, Toru
NEC Niigata Ltd., 7546, Oaza Yasuda
Kashiwazaki-shi, Niigata / JP
[1998/42]
Representative(s)Betten & Resch
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB
Postfach 10 02 51
80076 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1998/42]Betten & Resch
Reichenbachstrasse 19
80469 München / DE
Application number, filing date98106381.107.04.1998
[1998/42]
Priority number, dateJP1997009054209.04.1997         Original published format: JP 9054297
[1998/42]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0870617
Date:14.10.1998
Language:EN
[1998/42]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0870617
Date:02.02.2000
[2000/05]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP21.12.1999
ClassificationInternational:B41J2/175
[1998/42]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2000/41]
Former [1998/42]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Tintenpatrone mit Fähigkeit zur Verhinderung von Tintenlecks[1998/42]
English:Ink cartridge capable of preventing leak of ink[1998/42]
French:Cartouche d'encre capable d'éviter les fuites d'encre[1998/42]
Examination procedure26.05.2000Examination requested  [2000/30]
17.03.2003Application withdrawn by applicant  [2003/19]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.04.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
30.04.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
30.04.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[YA]JPH06238908  ;
 [YA]EP0640484  (CANON KK [JP]) [Y] 1-3,8,10,11 * page 7, line 25 - line 36; figure 2 * * page 13, line 13 - line 15; figures 30B,30C * [A] 4,5,7;
 [A]DE4411873  (SHARP KK [JP]) [A] 1-5,7,8,10,11 * column 8, line 51 - column 9, line 12; figures 8,9 *;
 [A]EP0739741  (CANON KK [JP]) [A] 1-4,7,10 * column 6, line 37 - column 7, line 2; figure 2 *
 [YA]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19941125), vol. 018, no. 620, Database accession no. (M - 1711), [Y] 1-3,8,10,11 * abstract * [A] 4,5,7