blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0871196

EP0871196 - Magnetron apparatus and manufacturing method for the same [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  30.05.2003
Database last updated on 22.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip22.05.2009Change - representativepublished on 24.06.2009  [2009/26]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MATSUSHITA ELECTRONICS CORPORATION
1-1, Saiwai-cho Takatsuki-shi
Osaka 569-1143 / JP
[N/P]
Former [1998/42]For all designated states
Matsushita Electronics Corporation
1-1, Saiwai-cho
Takatsuki-shi, Osaka 569-1143 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Yoshihara, Masanori
573, Kichisawa
Imaichi City, 321-1273 / JP
02 / Nakano, Yasunobu
35-11, Ichiriyama 5-chome
Otsu City, 520-2153 / JP
03 / Ochiai, Hiroshi
492, Nakaokamoto Kawauchimachi, Kawauchi-gun
Tochigi Pref., 329-1105 / JP
[1998/42]
Representative(s)advotec.
Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft
Tappe mbB
Widenmayerstraße 4
80538 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2009/26]advotec.
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Widenmayerstrasse 4
80538 München / DE
Former [1998/42]Dr. Elisabeth Jung Dr. Jürgen Schirdewahn Dipl.-Ing. Claus Gernhardt
Clemensstrasse 30
80803 München / DE
Application number, filing date98106576.609.04.1998
[1998/42]
Priority number, dateJP1997009348011.04.1997         Original published format: JP 9348097
[1998/42]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0871196
Date:14.10.1998
Language:EN
[1998/42]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0871196
Date:24.07.2002
Language:EN
[2002/30]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP05.08.1998
ClassificationIPC:H01J23/20, H01J25/587
[1998/42]
CPC:
H01J23/165 (EP,US); H01J2225/587 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [1999/25]
Former [1998/42]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Magnetrongerät und Verfahren zu dessen Herstellung[1998/42]
English:Magnetron apparatus and manufacturing method for the same[1998/42]
French:Appareil magnétron et son procédé de fabrication[1998/42]
Examination procedure09.04.1998Examination requested  [1998/42]
21.03.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
14.09.2000Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.06.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
22.10.2001Communication of intention to grant the patent
31.01.2002Fee for grant paid
31.01.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)25.04.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/29]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.04.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
27.04.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
30.04.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]US2433339  (BROWN WILLIAM C) [A] 1-6 * the whole document *;
 [A]JPS6452365
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19890613), vol. 013, no. 254, Database accession no. (E - 772), & JP01052365 A 19890228 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRONICS CORP) [A] 1-6 * abstract *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.